Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1283483

EP1283483 - Methods and systems for document navigation using enhanced thumbnails [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Database last updated on 25.08.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.07.2012  [2012/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Patent Department
Xerox Square - 20 A
100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, NY 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2011/31]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Former [2003/07]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rosenholtz, Ruth E.
980 Alice Lane 2
Menio Park, CA 94025 / US
02 / Woodruff, Allison G.
969 G Edgewater Blvd, 272
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
03 / Faulring, Andrew
1002 Flemington Street
Pittsburg, PA 15217 / US
[2003/07]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/07]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02017748.108.08.2002
[2003/07]
Priority number, dateUS2001068223008.08.2001         Original published format: US 682230
[2003/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1283483
Date:12.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1283483
Date:29.03.2006
[2006/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1283483
Date:03.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/31]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP13.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2003/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/49]
Former [2003/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Systeme zur Dokumentennavigation unter Benutzung von verbesserten verkleinerten Darstellungen[2003/07]
English:Methods and systems for document navigation using enhanced thumbnails[2003/07]
French:Procédés et Systèmes pour la navigation entre documents par l'utilisation de miniatures améliorées[2011/07]
Former [2003/07]Procédés et Systèmes pour la navigation des documents pour moyens des "ongles du pouce" améliorés
Examination procedure29.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/46]
22.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
13.12.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
25.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2011Fee for grant paid
15.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10012924.6  / EP2296096
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2007
Opposition(s)04.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US6271840
 [Y]  HORNBAEK K ET AL ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY: "READING OF ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS: THE USABILITY OF LINEAR, FISHEYE AND OVERVIEW+DETAIL INTERFACES" CHI 2001 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS. SEATTLE, WA, MARCH 31 - APRIL 5, 2001, CHI CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, 31 March 2001 (2001-03-31), pages 293-300, XP001090384 ISBN: 1-58113-327-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/365024.365118
 [A]  WOODRUFF A ET AL ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY: "USING THUMBNAILS TO SEARCH THE WEB" CHI 2001 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS. SEATTLE, WA, MARCH 31 - APRIL 5, 2001, CHI CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, 31 March 2001 (2001-03-31), pages 198-205, XP001090375 ISBN: 1-58113-327-8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/365024.365098
by applicant US6271840
    - 'Reading of Electronic Documents: The Usability of Linear, Fisheye, and Overview+Detail Interfaces' CHI 31 March 2001,
    - 'Using Thumbnails to Search the Web' CHI 31 March 2001,