EP1289112 - Three-phase hybrid AC-voltage/AC-voltage direct converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kolar, Johann Walter, Prof.-Dr., EHT Zürich ETHL PEC Laboratory, ETH Zentrum, ETL H22 Physikstrasse 3, 8092 Zürich / CH | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019093.0 | 28.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | AT20010001383 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: AT 13832001 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1289112 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1289112 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1289112 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/458 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
H02M5/4585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/50] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hybrider Dreiphasen-Wechselstrom-Wechselstrom-Direktumrichter | [2003/10] | English: | Three-phase hybrid AC-voltage/AC-voltage direct converter | [2003/10] | French: | Convertisseur hybride directe courant alternatif - courant alternatif triphasé | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 18.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6061256 (KOLAR JOHANN W [AT]) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [XY] - MINARI Y ET AL, "PWM-RECTIFIER/VOLTAGE-SOURCE INVERTER WITHOUT DC LINK COMPONENTS FOR INDUCTION MOTOR DRIVE", IEE PROCEEDINGS B. ELECTRICAL POWER APPLICATIONS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, GB, (19931101), vol. 140, no. 6, PART B, pages 363 - 368, XP000426984 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 4 | [PX] - KOLAR J W ET AL, "Novel three-phase AC-DC-AC sparse matrix converter", APEC 2002. 17TH. ANNUAL IEEE APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION. DALLAS, TX, MARCH 10 - 14, 2002, ANNUAL APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020310), VOL. 2 OF 2. CONF. 17, ISBN 0-7803-7404-5, pages 777 - 791, XP010583007 [PX] 1-4 * page 780 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2002.989333 | by applicant | - MINARI, Y. ET AL., "PWM-Rectifier/Voltage-Source Inverter without DC Link Components for Induction Motor Drive", IEEE PROCEEDINGS B. ELECTRICAL POWER APPLICATIONS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, (19931101), vol. 140, no. 6, pages 363 - 368 |