Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1266658

EP1266658 - Use of betulinic acid derivatives for the treatment and prevention of melanoma [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.08.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2007  [2007/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
352 Henry Administration Building
506 South Wright Street
Urbana, IL 61801 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
352 Henry Administration Building, 506 South Wright Street
Urbana, Illinois 61801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pezzuto, John, M.
846 Bonnie Brae Plaza
River Forest, IL 60305 / US
02 / Dasgupta, Tapas, K.
1317 Jackson Boulevard
River Forest, IL 60305 / US
03 / Kim, Darrick, S.H.L
834 Pinehurst Lane
Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US
 [2003/09]
Former [2002/51]01 / Pezzuto, John, M.
846 Bonnie Brae Plaza
River Forest, IL 60305 / US
02 / Dasgupta, Tapas, K.
1317 Jackson Boulevard
River Forest, IL 60305 / US
03 / Kim, Darrick, S.H.L
901 South Ashland Avenue, Apt. 803-A
Chicago, IL 60606 / US
Representative(s)Blum, Rudolf Emil , et al
E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst , et al
c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date02019173.006.04.1998
[2002/51]
Priority number, dateUS1997085801116.05.1997         Original published format: US 858011
[2002/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1266658
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1266658
Date:26.05.2004
[2004/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/19, A61P35/00
[2006/37]
Former International [2004/22]A61K31/19, A61K35/78
Former International [2002/51]A61K31/19, A61K31/56, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/51]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Betulinsäurederivaten zur Behandlung und Vorbeugung des Melanoms[2002/51]
English:Use of betulinic acid derivatives for the treatment and prevention of melanoma[2002/51]
French:Utilisation de dérivés de l'acide bétulinique pour le traitement et la prévention du mélanome[2002/51]
Examination procedure02.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
19.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/36]
10.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/36]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98915378.8  / EP0981341
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9629068  (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [X] 1,5,10,16-25 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH01143832  ;
 [X]WO9504526  (GLYCOMED INC [US]) [X] 1,4-6,15,17,18,22 * the whole document * * especially page 7, line 14-23 *;
 [X]WO9426725  (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [X] 5,10 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0542622  (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]) [X] 5,10 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19532006  (SAMLAND THOMAS [DE]) [X] 16,24,25 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9639033  (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,10,11,16 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9832443  (MARIGEN SA [CH], et al) [E] 1,4,5,16-25 * abstract * * page 26, paragraph 5 *;
 [E]WO9851294  (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [E] 1-25 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - MANEZ, S. ET AL, "Effect of selected triterpenoids on chronic dermal inflammation", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (19970903), vol. 334, no. 1, pages 103 - 105, XP002078026 [PX] 1,16 * page 104, column R; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-2999(97)01187-4
 [X]  - PISHA E ET AL, "Discovery of betulinic acid as a selective inhibitor of human melanoma that functions by induction of apoptosis.", NAT MED, OCT 1995, 1 (10) P1046-51, UNITED STATES, XP000611705 [X] 16,20,24,25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1095-1046
 [X]  - "News and features. II", FASEB JOURNAL, USA, (199505), vol. 9, no. 8, page 573, XP000611713 [X] 16,20,24,25 * page 573, column 1, lines 18-36 *
 [X]  - "Natural substances in the treatment of melanoma", MUNCHENER MEDIZINISCHE WOCHENSCHRIFT, 1996, 138/7 (18), GERMANY, XP000611701 [X] 16,20,24,25 * the whole document *
 [X]  - RYU S Y ET AL, "Antitumor triterpenes from medicinal plants", ARCHIVES OF PHARM. RESEARCH (SEOUL), 17 (5). 1994. 375-377., XP000610874 [X] 1,5,6,16-18,20-22,24,25 * the whole document * * especially page 376, Table I & Fig. 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890905), vol. 013, no. 399, Database accession no. (C - 632), [X] 1,5,7,16-18,20 * abstract *
 [X]  - KONOSHIMA, TAKAO ET AL, "Studies on inhibitors of skin-tumor promotion, I. Inhibitory effects of triterpenes from Euptelea polyandra on Epstein-Barr virus activation", J. NAT. PROD., 1987, 1167-70, XP000610894 [X] 1,4-6,16 * the whole document * * especially page 1169, lefthand column, line 19-20 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np50054a031
 [X]  - YASUKAWA, K. ET AL, "Some lupane-type triterpenes inhibit tumor promotion by 12-O-tetradecanoylphorbol-13-acetate in two-stage carcinogenesis in mouse skin", PHYTOMEDICINE, 1995, 309-13, XP000610925 [X] 1,5,10,16-25 * the whole document * * especially page 312, righthand column, line 11-12 *
 [X]  - MAURYA, S.K. ET AL, "Content of betulin and betulinic acid , antitumor agents of Zizyphus species", FITOTERAPIA, (1989), vol. 60, no. 5, pages 468 - 469, XP000612857 [X] 5,16 * the whole document *
 [X]  - BOGENRIEDER T ET AL, "Analysis of pentacyclic triterpene-mediated antiproliferative effects on malignant melanoma cells (Meeting abstract).", PROC ANNU MEET AM ASSOC CANCER RES;38:A1458 1997, XP002078027 [X] 16,24,25 * abstract *
 [X]  - NAGOURNEY RA ET AL, "Preliminary analysis of betulinic acid in human tumor primary cultures (Meeting abstract).", PROC ANNU MEET AM ASSOC CANCER RES;37:A2724 1996, XP002078028 [X] 16,24,25 * abstract *
 [X]  - DEL CARMEN RECIO M. ET AL, "Structural requirements for the anti-inflammatory activity of natural triterpenoids", PLANTA MEDICA, 1995, 61/2 (182-185), Germany, XP002078029 [X] 5 * the whole document *
 [X]  - EVERS, MICHEL ET AL, "Betulinic Acid Derivatives: A New Class of Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 Specific Inhibitors with a New Mode of Action", J. MED. CHEM., 1996, 39, 1056-68, XP002078030 [X] 1,6,10,16 * page 1061; table 1 *
 [X]  - FUJIOKA, TOSHIHIRO ET AL, "Anti-AIDS agents, 11. Betulinic acid and platanic acid as anti-HIV principles from Syzigium claviflorum, and the anti-HIV activity of structurally related triterpenoids", J. NAT. PROD., 1994, 57, 243-7, XP002078031 [X] 1,4,5,10,11,16 * page 245; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np50104a008
 [X]  - RAJARAM, P. ET AL, "Constituents of the roots of Diospyros chloroxylon Roxb", INDIAN DRUGS, 1988, 25, 211-12, XP002078032 [X] 16 * abstract *
 [X]  - BATTA, A. K. ET AL, "Crystalline chemical components of some vegetable drugs", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, 1973, 12, 214-16, XP002078033 [X] 1,6 * page 215 *
 [X]  - OTSUKA H ET AL, "Studies on anti-inflammatory agents. V. A new anti-inflammatory constituent of Pyracantha crenulata roem.", CHEM PHARM BULL (TOKYO), NOV 1981, 29 (11) P3099-104, JAPAN, XP002078034 [X] 1 * see page 3101, chart 2 and table I *
 [X]  - KASHIWADA, YOSHIKI ET AL, "Betulinic Acid and Dihydrobetulinic Acid Derivatives as Potent Anti-HIV Agents", J. MED. CHEM., 1996, 39, 1016-17, XP002078035 [X] 1,5,10,11,16 * the whole document *
 [X]  - WRZECIONO U ET AL, "Triterpene nitrogenous derivatives VI 3- and 28-aminolupane derivatives III", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (1972), vol. 77, ISSN 0009-2258, page 475, XP002909882 [X] 1,2 * abstract *