Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1398903

EP1398903 - Digital signature validation and generation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2011
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12, Postfach 130-251
D-64297 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/22]For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12, Postfach 130-251
D-64297 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2004/12]For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12, Postfach 130-251
D-64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Winkler, Kay Hans-Peter
Dieburgerstrasse 78
64287 Darmstradt / DE
02 / Körner, Michael Ulrich
Alt-Moabit 21
10559 Berlin / DE
03 / Schöning, Harald Ralf, Dr.
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
04 / Hermann, Eckehard
Darmstädter Strasse 64
64347 Griesheim / DE
05 / Kollmorgen, René
Hosemannstrasse 67
10409 Berlin / DE
06 / Kessler, Dieter Hermann
Mosselstrasse 29
64331 Gräfenhausen / DE
 [2004/12]
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/12]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date02020471.512.09.2002
[2004/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1398903
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1398903
Date:02.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32
[2004/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/12]
TitleGerman:Validierung und Erzeugung einer digitalen Unterschrift[2004/12]
English:Digital signature validation and generation[2004/12]
French:Validation et génération d'une signature numérique[2004/12]
Examination procedure06.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/45]
20.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2010Fee for grant paid
14.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
TR02.06.2010
BG02.09.2010
GR03.09.2010
IE12.09.2010
LU12.09.2010
ES13.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
FR30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
PT04.10.2010
[2013/46]
Former [2013/42]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
TR02.06.2010
BG02.09.2010
GR03.09.2010
IE12.09.2010
LU12.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
FR30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2012/47]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
BG02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
TR02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
IE12.09.2010
LU12.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
FR30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2012/44]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
BG02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
IE12.09.2010
LU12.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
FR30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2012/41]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
BG02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
IE12.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
FR30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/35]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
IE12.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
FR30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/19]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
DK02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/14]AT02.06.2010
BE02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
IT02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/10]AT02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
CZ02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
SK02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
PT04.10.2010
Former [2011/09]AT02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
EE02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
Former [2011/07]AT02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
NL02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
Former [2011/05]AT02.06.2010
CY02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
Former [2011/01]AT02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
GR03.09.2010
Former [2010/50]AT02.06.2010
FI02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
Former [2010/49]AT02.06.2010
SE02.06.2010
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0120513  (SOLO DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,9-13,16,17,19-23 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 6 * * page 10, line 15 - line 29 * * page 22, line 4 - line 23 * * page 28, line 7 - line 24 * * page 55, lines 1-4 *;
 [Y]WO0113574  (ACCELA COM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,9-13,16,17,19-23 * page 15, line 8 - line 15 *