Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1296309

EP1296309 - Method and circuit for driving display, and portable electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.12.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lenovo Innovations Limited (Hong Kong)
23rd Floor, Lincoln House
Taikoo Place
979 King's Road
Quarry Bay, Hong Kong / HK
[2015/01]
Former [2003/13]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ueda, Hideki
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2003/13]
Representative(s)Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/13]von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02020571.217.09.2002
[2003/13]
Priority number, dateJP2001028583819.09.2001         Original published format: JP 2001285838
[2003/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1296309
Date:26.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1296309
Date:19.05.2010
[2010/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/22, G09G3/20
[2009/51]
Former International [2003/13]G09G3/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2011/04]
Former [2003/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Schaltung zum Steuern einer Anzeige sowie tragbare elektronische Vorrichtung[2003/13]
English:Method and circuit for driving display, and portable electronic device[2003/13]
French:Méthode et circuit d'attaque d'un dispositif d'affichage, et dispositif électronique portable[2003/13]
Examination procedure13.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/43]
07.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.12.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR
15.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.12.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination24.02.2016Appeal received No.  T1119/16
12.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.10.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
28.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 16
28.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 18
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201514   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0655725  (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15,23,27 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 6 * * column 6, line 6 - line 11 * * column 2, line 16 - line 21 * [Y] 16-22,24,26,28-29,31-32;
 [Y]EP0750288  (TOSHIBA KK [JP] TOSHIBA KK) [Y] 16-22,28,32 * column 11, line 17 - line 58; figures 6, 7a, 7b, 8 * * column 2, line 39 - line 46 * * column 5, line 1 - line 9 *;
 [Y]WO9918495  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 24,29 * page 5, line 10 - line 16 *;
 [Y]  - MANHART K, "WINDOWS FUER SMARTPHONES", FUNKSCHAU, WEKA FACHZEITSCHRIFTEN VERLAG, POING, DE, (20010601), vol. 74, no. 12, ISSN 0016-2841, pages 28 - 30, XP001058710 [Y] 26,31 * the whole document *