Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1403695

EP1403695 - Device for exposure of an original comprising homogenised and superposed multiple point light sources [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.06.2006
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.07.2006  [2006/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AgfaPhoto GmbH
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[2005/10]
Former [2004/14]For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee
51373 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gressierer, Bernhard
Hörlstrasse 3A
85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE
02 / Lind, Martin
Fürstenbergstrasse 6
80809 München / DE
03 / Thoma, Ralph
Schenkendorfstrasse 49 1/2
86167 Augsburg / DE
04 / Bode, Andreas
Filchnerstrasse 32
81476 München / DE
05 / Melzer, Volker
Willinger Weg 16
81671 München / DE
 [2004/14]
Application number, filing date02021170.224.09.2002
[2004/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1403695
Date:31.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:G03B21/20, G03B27/54, G02B3/00, G02B27/09, G02B27/00, G02B27/18, H04N9/31
[2004/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/14]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Aufbelichten einer Vorlage mittels einer Vielzahl homogenisierter und überlagerter Punktlichtquellen[2004/14]
English:Device for exposure of an original comprising homogenised and superposed multiple point light sources[2004/14]
French:Dispositif d'exposition d'un original comprenant une pluralité de sources lumineuses ponctuelles homogenisées et superposées[2004/14]
Examination procedure30.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/49]
27.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/28]
08.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200504   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2001281600  ;
 [XY]EP0683425  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,14,15 * figure 20 * * column 5, line 4 - line 15 * * column 31, line 43 - column 34, line 33 * * column 7, line 28 - line 32 * [Y] 8-11;
 [Y]EP0888016  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 8-10 * page 2, line 45 - line 49 * * page 3, line 38 - line 48; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP0350901  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 12,13 * figure 3 *;
 [X]US6318863  (TIAO KUO-TUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 21 * * column 10, line 5 - line 38 * * figure 9A *;
 [X]JPH06265887
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, [X] 1-4,6,7,14,15 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 4,3,1 * [Y] 8-13
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941216), vol. 018, no. 670, Database accession no. (P - 1845), [X] 1 * abstract *