Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1267348

EP1267348 - Information record medium with information for prohibiting a user's operation, apparatus for recording the same and apparatus for reproducing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/51]Information record medium, apparatus for recording the same and apparatus for reproducing the same
[2011/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.2012  [2012/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION
1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP
[2011/01]
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION
No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshio, Junichi, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Yoshimura, Ryuichiro, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Nakamura, Hiroshi, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
04 / Moriyama, Yoshiaki, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
05 / Yamamoto, Kaoru, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
06 / Tozaki, Akihiro, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
07 / Sawabe, Takao, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Head Office, No. 4-1 Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku, Tokyo-to / JP
 [2003/01]
Former [2002/51]01 / Yoshio, Junichi, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Yoshimura, Ryuichiro, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Nakamura, Hiroshi, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
04 / Miriyama, Yoshiaki, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
05 / Yamamoto, Kaoru, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
06 / Tozaki, Akihiro, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
07 / Sawabe, Takao, Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Head Office, No. 4-1 Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku, Tokyo-to / JP
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date02021307.003.04.1997
[2002/51]
Priority number, dateJP1996008293204.04.1996         Original published format: JP 8293296
[2002/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1267348
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1267348
Date:06.05.2004
[2004/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1267348
Date:17.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/036, G11B27/10, G11B27/30, G11B27/32, // G09B5/06, G11B19/04, G11B19/12, H04N9/804
[2011/11]
Former International [2004/19]G11B20/12, G11B27/32, G11B27/30, G11B27/10, G11B27/034, G11B19/12, G09B5/06, H04N5/91, H04N9/804, H04N5/85, H04N5/781, G11B7/00
Former International [2002/51]G11B20/12, G11B27/32, G11B27/30, G11B27/10, G11B27/034, G11B19/12, G09B5/06, H04N5/91, H04N5/85, H04N5/781, G11B7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/51]
TitleGerman:Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium mit Informationen zum Verbieten einer Benutzer-Operation und Gerät zu dessen Aufzeichnung und Wiedergabe[2011/11]
English:Information record medium with information for prohibiting a user's operation, apparatus for recording the same and apparatus for reproducing the same[2011/11]
French:Support d'enregistrement d'informations avec des informations pour interdire une opération par un utilisateur et appareil d'enregistrement et de lecture associés[2011/11]
Former [2002/51]Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium und Gerät zu dessen Aufzeichnung und Wiedergabe
Former [2002/51]Information record medium, apparatus for recording the same and apparatus for reproducing the same
Former [2002/51]Support d'enregistrement d'informations et son appareil d'enregistrement et de lecture
Examination procedure02.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
11.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2011Fee for grant paid
27.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97302312.0  / EP0800164
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970302312) is  02.02.2001
Opposition(s)21.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0788106  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-3,5,15-17,19,22-24,26 * abstact * * page 4,line 20-page 5,line 57* * page 8,line 34-page 13,line 40 * * page 16,line 10-page 30,line 25 * * claims 9-27 *;
 [E]EP0795869  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,8-10,15-19,22-24 * page 8, line 4 - page 18, line 15; claims 1-13 * * proriority; the same applicant *;
 [A]EP0696798  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8,15,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0685845  (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,15,22 * the whole document *;
 [PA]EP0737980  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [PA] 1-3,8-10,15-17,22-24 * column 39, line 6 - column 40, line 45 * * column 51, line 20 - column 56, line 38 *