blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1310162

EP1310162 - Flying pet toy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oblack, Mark
900 SW Cedarglade
Issaquah, WA 98027 / US
[2003/20]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/20]
Representative(s)Vossius, Corinna, et al
Corinna Vossius IP Group
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Widenmayerstrasse 43
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]Vossius, Corinna, et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date02021847.527.09.2002
[2003/20]
Priority number, dateUS20010329472P10.10.2001         Original published format: US 329472 P
US2002024306812.09.2002         Original published format: US 243068
[2003/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1310162
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1310162
Date:10.09.2003
[2003/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1310162
Date:06.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2003
ClassificationIPC:A63H33/18, A01K15/02
[2003/37]
CPC:
A63H33/18 (EP,US); A01K15/025 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2003/20]A01K15/02, A63H33/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/20]
TitleGerman:Fliegendes Spielzeug für Haustier[2003/20]
English:Flying pet toy[2003/20]
French:Jouet volant pour animal domestique[2003/20]
Examination procedure27.09.2002Examination requested  [2003/20]
23.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2005Fee for grant paid
02.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ06.04.2005
EE06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
SK06.04.2005
TR06.04.2005
BG06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
CY27.09.2005
IE27.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
[2007/20]
Former [2007/10]CZ06.04.2005
EE06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
SK06.04.2005
TR06.04.2005
BG06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
IE27.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/52]CZ06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
SK06.04.2005
TR06.04.2005
BG06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
IE27.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/40]CZ06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
SK06.04.2005
BG06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
IE27.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/30]CZ06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
SK06.04.2005
BG06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/15]CZ06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
BG06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/14]FI06.04.2005
BG06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/13]FI06.04.2005
BG06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE06.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US4241533  (NEWSOME REGINALD W [US]) [A] 1,6,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5234367  (DECESARE JOHN J [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *;
 [XY]US5326299  (JASINSKI GENE M [US]) [X] 1-7,9,11,13,14 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 57 * * column 5, line 20 - line 30 * * column 6, line 61 - line 64 * * claim 1 * * figure - * [Y] 8,12;
 [A]US5358440  (ZHENG YU [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 2 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5674102  (LIN JEROME [TW]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6179737  (ADLER ALAN J [US]) [Y] 8,12 * column 3, line 37 - line 43 *
by applicantUSD461603S
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.