Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1298608

EP1298608 - Method, apparatus and system for gaming using a rotatable payout indicator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2015
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.03.2015  [2015/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IGT
6355 S. Buffalo Drive
Las Vegas, NV 89113 / US
[2013/52]
Former [2003/21]For all designated states
IGT
9295 Prototype Drive
Reno, Nevada 89521 / US
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
ANCHOR GAMING
815 Pilot Road, Suite G
Las Vegas, Nevada 89119 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Miller, Charles R.
2079 Smoketree Village Circle
Henderson, Nevada 89012 / US
02 / Johnson, Brian A.
278 Barletta Avenue
Las Vegas, Nevada 89123 / US
03 / Stanek, James R.
310 Modesto Street
Henderson, Nevada 89014 / US
04 / Deville, Canyon
560 Dusty Pine Place
Henderson, Nevada 89052 / US
05 / MacVittie, Michael
4201 S. Decatur Blvd., No. 3195
Las Vegas, Nevada 89123 / US
06 / Adams, William R.
5870 Darby
Las Vagas, Nevada 89146 / US
 [2003/14]
Representative(s)Franzolin, Luigi
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2012/20]Franzolin, Luigi
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Former [2009/30]Körber, Martin Hans , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
Former [2003/14]Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date02021907.727.09.2002
[2003/14]
Priority number, dateUS2001096633327.09.2001         Original published format: US 966333
[2003/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1298608
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1298608
Date:13.10.2004
[2004/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/32
[2003/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/14]
TitleGerman:Spielverfahren, -vorrichtung und -system mit einer drehenden Auszahlungsanzeige[2003/14]
English:Method, apparatus and system for gaming using a rotatable payout indicator[2003/14]
French:Procédé, dispositif et système de jeu avec indicateur de prix rotatif[2003/14]
Examination procedure21.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/08]
20.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/11]
28.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/11]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201413   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2356353  (PROJECT LEISURE LIMITED) [X] 1,24,36,43-46 * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 8 * * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 13; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-23,25-35,37-42;
 [YA]US2001003709  (ADAMS) [Y] 2-4,10-23,25-27,32-35 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,24,36,43-46;
 [YPA]US2001054794  (COLE ET AL) [YP] 5-7,28,29,37-39 * paragraph [0128]; figure 4 * [AP] 1,24,36,43-46;
 [YPA]US2001034259  (LUCIANO ET AL.) [YP] 8,9,30,31,40-42 * paragraph [0043]; figure 4 * [AP] 1,24,36,43-46;
 [XA]US5722891  (INOUE) [X] 1,24,36,43-46 * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 2; figure 6 * [A] 2-23,25-35,37-42;
 [XA]GB2268415  (BELL-FRUIT MANUFACTURING COMPANY LIMITED) [X] 1,24,36,43-46 * page 13, line 10 - page 23, line 6; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-23,25-35,37-42;
 [XPA]US2002086728  (BENNETT ET AL.) [XP] 1,24,36,43-46 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0040]; figures 2-4 * [AP] 2-23,25-35,37-42;
 [A]WO0114030  (AC COIN AND SLOT SERVICE COMPANY) [A] 1,24,36,43-46 * page 6, line 19 - page 17, line 20; figures 1-12 *;
 [A]US6173955  (PERRIE ET AL.) [A] 1,24,36,43-46 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 14 *