Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320162

EP1320162 - Wall mounted plastic distribution box [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaiser GmbH & Co. KG
Ramsloh 4
D-58579 Schalksmühle / DE
[2003/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Viola, Marc
Wielsiepen 28
58579 Schalksmühle / DE
02 / Wangemann, Anke
Schlüchtern 5
58579 Schalksmühle / DE
03 / Schlöter, Reinhard
Schubertstrasse 2
58566 Kierspe / DE
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Köchling, Conrad-Joachim
Patentanwälte Köchling, Döring PartG mbB
Fleyer Strasse 135
58097 Hagen / DE
[2016/01]
Former [2003/25]Köchling, Conrad-Joachim
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135
58097 Hagen / DE
Application number, filing date02022007.501.10.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateDE200116073611.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10160736
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320162
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320162
Date:30.12.2015
Language:DE
[2016/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H02G3/12
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2016/01]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Hohlwanddose aus Kunststoff[2003/25]
English:Wall mounted plastic distribution box[2003/25]
French:Boîte de distribution en plastique montée au mur[2003/25]
Examination procedure10.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/37]
12.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2015Fee for grant paid
30.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.03.2015
Opposition(s)03.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
29.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
28.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
30.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
PT02.05.2016
AT01.10.2016
GB01.10.2016
IE01.10.2016
LU01.10.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/29]CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
PT02.05.2016
AT01.10.2016
GB01.10.2016
IE01.10.2016
LU01.10.2016
Former [2018/10]CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
PT02.05.2016
AT01.10.2016
GB01.10.2016
IE01.10.2016
LU01.10.2016
Former [2017/51]CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
PT02.05.2016
GB01.10.2016
IE01.10.2016
LU01.10.2016
Former [2017/42]CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
PT02.05.2016
GB01.10.2016
LU01.10.2016
Former [2016/46]CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/30]FI30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
GR31.03.2016
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4222042  (KAISER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,7;
 [XA]DE2526853  (KAISER KG) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [A]EP1014523  (LEGRAND SA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figure 8 *