Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1523025

EP1523025 - Field emission-type electron source [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2013
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2012/11]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd.
1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka / JP
Former [2005/15]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Komoda, Takuya
c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
02 / Takegawa, Yoshiyuki
c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
03 / Aizawa, Koichi
c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
04 / Hatai, Takashi
c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
05 / Ichihara, Tsutomu
c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
06 / Honda, Yoshiaki
c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
07 / Watabe, Yoshifumi
c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
08 / Baba, Toru
c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd.
1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
 [2012/22]
Former [2005/15]01 / Komoda, Takuya
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
02 / Takegawa, Yoshiyuki
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
03 / Aizawa, Koichi
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
04 / Hatai, Takashi
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
05 / Ichihara, Tsutomu
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
06 / Honda, Yoshiaki
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
07 / Watabe, Yoshifumi
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
08 / Baba, Toru
Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/51]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2005/15]Dallmeyer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date02022014.101.10.2002
[2005/15]
Priority number, dateJP2002008392725.03.2002         Original published format: JP 2002083927
JP2002008392825.03.2002         Original published format: JP 2002083928
[2005/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1523025
Date:13.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1523025
Date:20.04.2005
[2005/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1523025
Date:19.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01J1/312
[2005/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2005/15]
TitleGerman:Feldemissionselektronenquelle[2005/15]
English:Field emission-type electron source[2005/15]
French:Source d'électrons à émission de champ[2005/15]
Examination procedure01.10.2002Examination requested  [2005/15]
13.12.2002Request for decision received: Priority
01.03.2005Result of request for decision (Priority): Request rejected
03.08.2006Date of oral proceedings
24.11.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2012Fee for grant paid
31.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination02.05.2005Appeal received No.  J0013/05
01.07.2005Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.09.2011
Opposition(s)20.09.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
27.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
28.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
30.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
TR19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
PT19.04.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2014/25]BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
MC19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/48]BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/40]BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/35]BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/34]BE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/33]BE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/21]SE19.12.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1056110  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * claims 1-7 *;
 [A]EP1094484  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]EP1096532  (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [AD]JP2001126610  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP);
 [A]US2001017515  (KUSUNOKI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [AD]JP2001243901  (HITACHI LTD)
ExaminationEP1117118
 WO0074098
 US6818941
 EP0367195
by applicantJP2987140B
 JP2001126610
 EP1117118
 WO0074098