EP1316717 - Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/34] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egler, Walter Eichenweg 8 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Gruber, Peter, et al Robert Bosch GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Gruber, Peter (DE), et al Robert Bosch GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022359.0 | 08.10.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | DE2001158659 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158659 | [2003/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1316717 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1316717 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316717 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M47/02, F02M57/02, F02M59/36, F02M45/02, F02M45/12 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
F02M45/02 (EP,US);
F02M45/04 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M57/02 (EP,US);
F02M59/366 (EP,US);
F02M61/205 (EP,US);
F02M63/0007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/34] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2003/23] | English: | Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine | [2003/23] | French: | Dispositif d'injection de carburant pour un moteur à combustion interne | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 17.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.08.2005 | IT | 24.08.2005 | [2007/38] |
Former [2007/10] | ES | 24.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0114724 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 4, line 28 - page 6, line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0840003 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4118236 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]) [A] 1-3,18 * column 7, line 36 - line 61; figure 11 * | by applicant | EP0957261 |