Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1408141

EP1408141 - Process and electrolyte for the galvanic deposition of bronze [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/16]Process for galvanic deposition of bronze
[2014/35]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
29.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Enthone Inc.
350 Frontage Road
West Haven, Connecticut 06516 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Enthone Inc.
350 Frontage Road West Haven
Connecticut 06516 / US
Former [2004/16]For all designated states
ENTHONE INC.
350 Frontage Road
West Haven, Connecticut 06516 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zschintzsch, Katrin
Schellberg 29
40789 Monheim / DE
02 / Heyer, Joachim Dr.
Im Grund 25a
53819 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE
03 / Kleinfeld, Marlies Dr.
Monhofsfeld 142
42369 Wuppertal / DE
04 / Schäfer, Stefan
Margareten St. 37g
42651 Solingen / DE
05 / Steinius, Ortrud
Laubengang 6
42279 Wuppertal / DE
 [2004/16]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/51]
Former [2013/39]Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte
Hafenspitze
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2004/16]Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date02022718.711.10.2002
[2004/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1408141
Date:14.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1408141
Date:17.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:C25D3/58, C25D3/60
[2004/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Elektrolyt zur galvanischen Abscheidung von Bronzen[2014/35]
English:Process and electrolyte for the galvanic deposition of bronze[2014/35]
French:Methode et électrolyte pour la deposition galvanique des bronzes[2014/35]
Former [2004/16]Verfahren zur galvanischen Abscheidung von Bronzen
Former [2004/16]Process for galvanic deposition of bronze
Former [2004/16]Methode pour la deposition galvanique des bronzes
Examination procedure30.09.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2003Examination requested  [2004/16]
27.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2014Fee for grant paid
06.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.09.2015  05.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstrasse 20
10553 Berlin / DE
 [2016/31]
Former [2015/43]
Opponent(s)01  17.09.2015   
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstraße 20
10553 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Wonnemann, Jörg
Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent Management Erasmusstraße 20
10553 Berlin / DE
22.10.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.04.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
19.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.04.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition19.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1402/17
01.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
15.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
19.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
13.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
29.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG17.12.2014
CY17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
IE11.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/45]CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
IE11.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
Former [2016/33]CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
Former [2016/28]CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/36]CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/35]EE17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/24]FI17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
GR18.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI17.12.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1091023  (SHIPLEY COMPANY LLC) [X] 1-20,23,24,27-29 * paragraphs [0020] , [0023] , [0027] , [0032] , [0044] , [0055] * * claim 13 *;
 [X]DE10046600  (SCHLOETTER FA DR ING MAX) [X] 1-20,27,28 * example 1 * * paragraphs [0024] , [0032] , [0034] *;
 [X]US5443714  (SCHMIDT KARL-JUERGEN ET AL) [X] 1-8,10-20,23,27,28 * example 2 * * claims 1-3,14-17 *;
 [E]US2002187364  (EGLI ANDRE ET AL) [E] 1-8,10,13-20,25,28 * example 2 *;
 [XA]EP1001054  (UYEMURA C & CO LTD) [X] 1-6,9-18,21,24,26,27 * examples 6,7,36 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0037]; claim 8 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0040] , [0041] , [0037] * [A] 21,23,25,29;
 [XDA]EP1111097  (NIPPON MACDERMID CO LTD) [XD] 1-6,9,10,13-19,25,26 * example -; table . * * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0016] * * claim - * [A] 7,8,11,12,19,20,27-29;
 [E]US6508927  (OKA TERUYA ET AL) [E] 1-6,9-18,27 * example 6 *;
 [E]EP1260614  (SHIPLEY CO L L C) [E] 1-6,11-18,27 * paragraphs [0028] , [0046] , [0048] * * example 1 * * page 8, lines 26,27 *;
 [XA]US6458264  (TOKIO KANAE ET AL) [X] 1-5,10,11,13-17,22 * examples 1,6 * * claims 2,3,11 * * column 4, paragraph 2 * * example 3 * * column 7, line 35 * [A] 7,9,19,24,28,29;
 [X]JPH11181589  ;
 [X]JPH0813185  ;
 [XA]US4565608  (HOFFACKER GERD ET AL) [X] 29 * examples 1-5 * [A] 1,13;
 [AD]US6176996  (MOON SUNGSOO) [AD] 1-7,10,13-19,22,24,28,29 * example - *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11181589 A 19990706 (JAPAN ENERGY CORP) [X] 1,3,4,13,15,16 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08013185 A 19960116 (EBARA YUUJIRAITO KK) [X] 1,3,4,13,15,16 * abstract *
ExaminationJPH0813185
 JPH11181589