Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317153

EP1317153 - Telecommunications system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.05.2015
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2015Revocation of patentpublished on 24.06.2015  [2015/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RPX Corporation
One Market Plaza Steuart Tower Suite 700
San Francisco, CA 94105 / US
[2011/34]
Former [2008/21]For all designated states
Celltrace LLC
15455 Dallas Parkway, 6th Floor
Addison, TX 75001 / US
Former [2008/16]For all designated states
Acacia Patent Acquisition Corporation
500 Newport Center Drive, 7th Floor
Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP INTER-CORPORATE LICENSING LIMITED
10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane
London EC4A 7SB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Dervan, Aden William
90 Sedlescombe Road
Fulham, SW6 1RD / GB
02 / Michaels, Wayne David
Poplars Farm, Crouch Lane
Winkfield, Windsor SL4 4TL / GB
03 / Timson, Anthony Richard
10 Prospect Quay, Point Pleasant
London SW18 1PR / GB
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/02]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2008/21]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2008/04]Hale, Peter
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2005/16]Molnia, David , et al
Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13
80538 München / DE
Former [2003/23]Clarke, Gavin Richard Houghton
BTG International Ltd 10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane
London EC4M 7SB / GB
Application number, filing date02022772.415.06.1994
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateGB1993001377202.07.1993         Original published format: GB 9313772
GB1993001409608.07.1993         Original published format: GB 9314096
GB1993001232015.06.1993         Original published format: GB 9312320
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1317153
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1317153
Date:27.02.2008
[2008/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317153
Date:27.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/18, // H04W4/14
[2010/36]
Former International [2003/23]H04Q7/22, H04Q7/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/23]
TitleGerman:Telekommunikationssystem[2003/23]
English:Telecommunications system[2003/23]
French:Système de télécommunications[2003/23]
Examination procedure11.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/23]
17.01.2004Observations by third parties
06.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2011Fee for grant paid
13.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94917755.4  / EP0704140
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19940917755) is  18.09.1998
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.04.2012  25.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Morpho Cards GmbH
Konrad-Zuse-Ring 1
24220 Flintbek / DE
Opponent's representative
Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
 02  27.04.2012  29.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Telekom Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Kampfenkel, Klaus
Blumbach - Zinngrebe
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
 03  27.04.2012  29.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
CP8 TECHNOLOGIES
6, rue de la Verrerie
92197 Meudon / FR
Opponent's representative
Scheer, Luc
GEMALTO SA Département Propriété Industrielle Avenue du Jujubier ZI Athelia IV BP 90
13705 La Ciotat Cedex / FR
 04  27.04.2012  29.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Swisscom (Schweiz) AG
3050 Bern / CH
Opponent's representative
P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.)
Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4
P.O. Box 2848
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
 05  27.04.2012  30.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Patent und Lizenzen
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Branzka, Thomas
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Patent- und Lizenzabteilung
Postfach 80 07 29
81607 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/23]
Opponent(s)01  26.04.2012   
Morpho Cards GmbH
Konrad-Zuse-Ring 1
24220 Flintbek / DE
Opponent's representative
Stöckeler, Ferdinand
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler, Zinkler & Partner
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach / DE
 02  27.04.2012   
Telekom Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Opponent's representative
Kampfenkel, Klaus
Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
 03  27.04.2012   
CP8 TECHNOLOGIES
6 Rue de la Verrerie
92197 Meudon / FR
Opponent's representative
Scheer, Luc
GEMALTO SA Département Propriété Industrielle Avenue du Jujubier ZI Athelia IV BP 90
13705 La Ciotat Cedex / FR
 04  27.04.2012   
Swisscom (Schweiz) AG
3050 Bern / CH
Opponent's representative
P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.)
Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4
P.O. Box 2848
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
 05  27.04.2012   
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Branzka, Thomas
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 80 07 29
D-81607 München / DE
08.06.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.10.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.10.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2014
23.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
06.02.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
16.02.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/26]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.02.2010Request for further processing filed
04.02.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.02.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
11.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
11.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 12
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 13
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 14
12.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 15
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 16
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 17
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 18
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.07.2011
BE27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
ES07.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
IE15.06.2012
LU15.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
GB15.06.2013
DE17.06.2014
[2014/38]
Former [2014/27]AT27.07.2011
BE27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
ES07.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
IE15.06.2012
LU15.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
GB15.06.2013
Former [2014/21]AT27.07.2011
BE27.07.2011
DK27.07.2011
IT27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
ES07.11.2011
PT28.11.2011
IE15.06.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
GB15.06.2013
Former [2012/11]AT27.07.2011
BE27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
PT28.11.2011
Former [2012/10]BE27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
SE27.07.2011
GR28.10.2011
PT28.11.2011
Former [2012/09]BE27.07.2011
NL27.07.2011
PT28.11.2011
Former [2012/08]NL27.07.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]US5046082  (ZICKER ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 2, line 16 - line 23 * * column 5, line 59 - line 62 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 6 * * column 7, line 45 - line 50 * * column 9, line 1 - line 18 * * column 9, line 36 - line 40 * * column 9, line 49 - line 52 * * column 19, line 29 - line 47 * * column 19, line 48 - line 52 * * column 19, line 54 - column 20, line 15 * * column 20, line 26 - column 21, line 5 * * column 23, line 38 - line 44 * * column 25, line 55 - line 63 * * column 27, line 63 - column 28, line 14 *;
 [XP]EP0562890  (HUTCHISON MICROTEL LIMITED [GB]) [XP] 1,2,8,14,15,18 * column 3, line 1 - line 12 * * column 3, line 36 - line 42 * * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 58 *
by applicantUS5046082
 EP0562890
otherWO9214329
 EP0278312
 US4852146
 GB2249923
    - Release Note, Recommendation GSM 11.11., Specification of the SIM-ME Interface, February 1992, Pages 1 - 128, XP002970920
    - "Release Note, Recommendation GSM 02.17, Subscriber Identity Modules, Functional Characteristics,", ETSI TC-SMG, XX, XX, XX, (19920201), pages 1 - 14, XP002970921
    - "Public Key Cryptography and "Over The Air Registration"", TIMEG 08, WIESBADEN, (19910514), pages 2 - 5, XP002970922
    - REPORT OF THE 9TH SIMEG MEETING, GEMENOS, FR, (19890503), pages 1 - 8, XP002970923
    - "Provision for application transparancy in the GSM Recommendation 11.11", SIMEG DOCUMENT 48/89, (198903), pages 1 - 4, XP002970924
    - "Results of the ISO/JTC1/SC17/WG4/T.F.3 meeting in Rennes, 19-20 Jan 1989, on provisional interindustry commands for international interchange", SIMEG DOCUMENT 13/89, (198901), pages 1 - 4, XP002970925
    - "Functional splitting of the mobile station in mobile equipment and subscriber identity module", DOCUMENT GSM 173/87, BONN, (198709), pages 1 - 10, XP002970926
    - "Agenda of Escat 1989 Conference,", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ESCAT CONFERENCE, XX, XX, XX, (19890101), pages 1 - 3, XP002970927
    - HEGENBARTH M., "IC CARD PROTOCOLS - The State of ISO Standardisation", ESCAT '89, HELSINKI, (19890906), pages 1 - 22, XP002970928
    - "Agenda of ESCAT 1992 Conference,", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ESCAT CONFERENCE, XX, XX, XX, (19920101), pages 1 - 3, XP002970929
    - HEGENBARTH M., "S C STANDARDIZATION WORKS - From Confusion to Clarity ?", ESCAT 1992, HELSINKI, (199209), pages 163 - 180, XP002970930