Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1308155

EP1308155 - Injectable solution containing a colloid of iron and shark cartilage-derived chondroitin sulfate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2007
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPRO CORPORATION
9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-Chome
Kita-ku, Osaka 531-8510 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
NIPRO CORPORATION
9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-Chome
Kita-ku, Osaka 531-8510 / JP
Former [2003/19]For all designated states
Nipro Corporation
9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-Chome
Kita-ku, Osaka 531-8510 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nishida, Seiji
Nipro Corporation, 9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka 531-8510 / JP
02 / Katayama, Naohisa
Nipro Corporation, 9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka 531-8510 / JP
03 / Katsumata, Takashi
Nipro Corporation, 9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka 531-8510 / JP
04 / Sato, Makoto
Nipro Corporation, 9-3, Honjo-Nishi 3-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka 531-8510 / JP
 [2003/19]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2003/19]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date02022911.810.10.2002
[2003/19]
Priority number, dateJP2001031497712.10.2001         Original published format: JP 2001314977
[2003/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1308155
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1308155
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1308155
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/08, A61K33/26, A61K47/36, A61K47/48, A61P7/06
[2003/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/09]
Former [2003/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Injektionslösung enthaltend ein Kolloid aus Eisen und Haiknorpel-Chondroitinsulfat[2003/19]
English:Injectable solution containing a colloid of iron and shark cartilage-derived chondroitin sulfate[2003/19]
French:Solution injectable contenant un colloide de fer et chondroitine sulfate de cartilage de requin[2003/19]
Examination procedure11.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/02]
10.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2006Fee for grant paid
27.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/50]
Former [2007/38]IT21.06.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2454447  (BIOINDUSTRIA SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-9 * examples 1-4 *;
 [Y]FR2804022  (CTPP COOPERATIVE DE TRAITEMENT [FR]) [Y] 1-9 * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 31 *;
 JPH03247296  [ ] (JAPAN RES DEV CORP, et al);
 [Y]WO9309766  (ARTHRO RES & DEV CORP [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 2 *
 [X]  - SIPOS, P. ET AL., "Rod-like iron(III) oxyhydroxide particles in iron(III)-polysaccharide solutions", JOURNAL OF INORGANIC BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 58, no. 2, pages 129 - 138, XP002234021 [X] 1-9 * See 'Materials' and 'Preparation of the complexes' *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0162-0134(94)00042-9
 [Y]  - KATO, T. ET AL., "Chondroitin sulfate iron colloid as an MR contrast agent for the hepatic reticuloendothelial system", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER ASSISTED TOMOGRAPHY, (1993), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 603 - 608, XP009006954 [Y] 1-9 * See abstract and 'Discussion' on page 607 left column *
 [Y]  - ABDATA PHARMA-DATEN-SERVICE, Pharmazeutische Stoffliste, 13. Auflage, ESCHBORN/TAUNUS, WERBE- UND VERTRIEBSGESELLSCHAFT DEUTSCHER APOTHEKER M.B.H, (2002), XP002234022 [Y] 1-9 * See C-Ch (4/2002), page 453, ABDATA-Nr.: 61907 *
 [Y]  - BARONE, D. ET AL., "Ferric chondroitin 6-sulfate (Condrofer(R)): A new potent antianaemic agent with a favourable pharmacokinetic profile", DRUGS EXPTL. CLIN. RES., SUPPL. 1, (1988), vol. XIV, pages 1 - 14, XP009007325 [Y] 1-9 * See page 3 *
 [Y]  - RONCA, G. ET AL., "Metabolic fate of partially depolymerized shark chondroitin sulfate in man", INT. J. CLIN. PHARM. RES., (1993), vol. XIII (Suppl.), pages 27 - 34, XP009006912 [Y] 1-9 * See 'Material and methods' *
 [Y]  - RODRIGUEZ, D. ET AL., "Preparation of chondroitin sulfate from shark cartilage", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880307), vol. 108, no. 10, Database accession no. 81913, XP002150348 [Y] 1-9 * abstract *
    [] - REV. CUBANA FARM., Havana, CUBA, (1987), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 133 - 140,
 [Y]  - "Manufacture of low-molecular weight chondroitin sulfuric acid with chondroitinase", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920316), vol. 116, no. 11, Database accession no. 104510, XP002150347 [Y] 1-9 * abstract *