blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1413791

EP1413791 - Friction lining segment, friction lining and method of their manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BorgWarner, Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US
[2008/37]
Former [2005/48]For all designated states
BorgWarner Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills MI 48326 / US
Former [2004/18]For all designated states
BorgWarner, Inc.
Powertrain Technical Center, 3800 Automation Drive, Ste. 100
Auburn Hills, MI 48236-1782 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fabricius, Emilio
Im Brückenfeld 8
67823 Oftersheim / DE
02 / Otremba, Markus
Dreikönigstrasse 17
68723 Schwetzingen / DE
03 / Lenk, Meike
Melibokusweg 4
64579 Gernsheim / DE
 [2004/18]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/18]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date02023564.423.10.2002
[2004/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1413791
Date:28.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1413791
Date:07.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2003
ClassificationIPC:F16D69/00, F16D13/64, F16D25/12, F16D25/0638
[2004/18]
CPC:
F16D69/00 (EP,KR,US); F16D13/648 (EP,US); F16D25/0638 (EP,US);
F16D25/12 (EP,US); F16D2069/004 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/03]
Former [2004/18]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Reibbelagsegment, Reibbelag und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[2004/18]
English:Friction lining segment, friction lining and method of their manufacturing[2004/18]
French:Segment de garniture de friction, garniture de friction et procédé de leur fabrication[2004/18]
Examination procedure22.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/25]
23.04.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2005Fee for grant paid
26.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04009494.8  / EP1457697
Opposition(s)08.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/50]
Former [2007/38]IT07.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US4260047  (NELS TERRY E) [A] 12,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0771962  (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [A] 15 * abstract * * figure 3 *;
 [XA]US5713450  (QUIGLEY JAMES R [US]) [X] 1,2,8,14 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * [A] 12;
 [A]EP0848177  (ADVANCED FRICTION MATERIALS CO [US]) [A] 1,8,12,14 * abstract * * figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US6013696  (HILL LARRY OATHER [US], et al) [A] 15 * abstract * * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 3 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US6170629  (SUZUKI HIROTSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,12,14 * abstract * * figures 1-6 *;
 [D]DE69701946T  (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]);
 [XA]US2002043441  (FUJITA KAZUYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,14 * column 2, paragraph 22 - paragraph 23 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 12,15
by applicantDE2854051
 US4280609
 DE3532759
 EP0521843
 DE69701946T
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.