blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1413459

EP1413459 - Visual angle-dependent imaging device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huang, Kuo-Pao
41-5F, Ji-Jia Road, Chiao-His Hsiang
Yi-Liang Hsien / TW
[2004/18]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2004/18]
Representative(s)Gritschneder, Martin, et al
Abitz & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/18]Gritschneder, Martin, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
Application number, filing date02023761.624.10.2002
[2004/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1413459
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2003
ClassificationIPC:B44C5/00, B44F1/06, B44F1/10, A47G33/02
[2004/18]
CPC:
B44F1/10 (EP,US); A47G33/00 (EP,US); B44C5/00 (EP,US);
B44C5/005 (EP,US); B44F1/02 (EP,US); F21W2121/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2101/00 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/18]
TitleGerman:Abbildungsvorrichtung, dessen Bild von dem Sichtwinkel abhängt[2004/18]
English:Visual angle-dependent imaging device[2004/18]
French:Dispositif de formation d'images dépendantes de l'angle d'observation[2004/18]
Examination procedure16.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/42]
15.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/49]
05.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR771394  (HOLOPHANE) [A] 1* the whole document *;
 [XY]US5763102  (YAU PETER [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 37 - line 38 * * column 5, line 10 - line 19 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 67 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 2;
 [YA]US6184628  (RUTHENBERG DOUGLAS [US]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 33 - line 51 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.