Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1331491

EP1331491 - Circuit for injecting test signals in an amplifier circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2008
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GmbH
Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235
28305 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/48]For all designated states
ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH
Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235
28305 Bremen / DE
Former [2003/44]For all designated states
ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GmbH
Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235
28305 Bremen / DE
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
STN ATLAS Elektronik GmbH
Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235
28305 Bremen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wittschief, Norbert
Wilhelm Leuschner Strasse 6
28832 Achim / DE
 [2003/31]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/44]
Former [2003/31]Thul, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys.
Zentrale Patentabteilung, Rheinmetall AG, Rheinmetall Allee 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date02023765.724.10.2002
[2003/31]
Priority number, dateDE200210356229.01.2002         Original published format: DE 10203562
[2003/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1331491
Date:30.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1331491
Date:01.12.2004
[2004/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1331491
Date:28.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/526, G01S15/04, G01S15/06
[2004/49]
Former International [2003/31]G01S7/526
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/31]
TitleGerman:Schaltungsanordnung zur Einspeisung von Testsignalen in eine Verstärkungsschaltung[2003/31]
English:Circuit for injecting test signals in an amplifier circuit[2003/31]
French:Circuit pour introduire des signaux de test dans un circuit d'amplification[2007/30]
Former [2003/31]Circuit d'alimentation des signaux de test dans un circuit d'amplification
Examination procedure07.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/23]
01.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2007Fee for grant paid
25.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
13.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
16.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.11.2007
CZ28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
EE28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
IE28.11.2007
SK28.11.2007
TR28.11.2007
BG28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
GR29.02.2008
ES11.03.2008
PT28.04.2008
[2010/37]
Former [2009/33]CY28.11.2007
CZ28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
EE28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
IE28.11.2007
SK28.11.2007
BG28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
GR29.02.2008
ES11.03.2008
PT28.04.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
EE28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
IE28.11.2007
SK28.11.2007
BG28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
GR29.02.2008
ES11.03.2008
PT28.04.2008
Former [2009/13]CZ28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
IE28.11.2007
SK28.11.2007
BG28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
GR29.02.2008
ES11.03.2008
PT28.04.2008
Former [2008/48]CZ28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
IE28.11.2007
SK28.11.2007
BG28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
ES11.03.2008
PT28.04.2008
Former [2008/42]CZ28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
SK28.11.2007
BG28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
ES11.03.2008
PT28.04.2008
Former [2008/39]CZ28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
SK28.11.2007
BG28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
ES11.03.2008
Former [2008/35]CZ28.11.2007
DK28.11.2007
FI28.11.2007
BG28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
ES11.03.2008
Former [2008/24]FI28.11.2007
BG28.02.2008
SE28.02.2008
ES11.03.2008
Former [2008/23]SE28.02.2008
ES11.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]US6046632  (STRAW TIMOTHY B [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 10, line 24 - column 11, line 50; figures 4,9 *;
 [Y]US5477504  (HAGERTY JAMES D [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 4, line 15 - line 29; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US4689578  (SPYCHALSKI STEPHEN E [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 39; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [Y]US4855685  (HOCHSCHILD JAMES R [US]) [Y] 7 * figure 5 *;
 [A]US4972381  (MITCHELL BRUCE C [MG], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 3 *