Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318232

EP1318232 - Calender and paper or cardboard web smoothing process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/24]Calender and process smoothing a paper or cardboard web
[2006/11]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 11.09.2013  [2013/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Pöltener Str. 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/37]For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2006/26]For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kurtz, Rüdiger, Dr.
Backnanger Weg 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
02 / Schneid, Josef
Rutteshalde 6
88267 Vogt / DE
03 / Hermsen, Thomas
Im Huck 14
47661 Issum / DE
04 / Gabbusch, Udo
Kräuterhof 15
45699 Herten / DE
05 / Hess, Harald
Am Ottersberg 20
88287 Grünkraut / DE
06 / Fenske, Rainer
Biberstrasse 51
89537 Giengen / DE
07 / Wassermann, Alexander
Kupelwiesergasse 12/2A
1130 Wien / AT
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Knoblauch, Andreas
Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB
Reuterweg 51-53
60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing.
Schlosserstrasse 23
60322 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date02024065.129.10.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateDE200115768624.11.2001         Original published format: DE 10157686
[2003/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1318232
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1318232
Date:10.09.2003
[2003/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318232
Date:28.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:D21G1/00
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   SE [2004/23]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kalander und Verfahren zum Glätten einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn[2003/24]
English:Calender and paper or cardboard web smoothing process[2006/11]
French:Calandre et procédé pour le lissage d'une bande de papier ou carton[2006/11]
Former [2003/24]Calender and process smoothing a paper or cardboard web
Former [2003/24]Calandre et procédé pour le lissage d' une bande de papier ou carton
Examination procedure09.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/41]
13.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2006Fee for grant paid
29.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.03.2007  12.12.2012  WITHDRAWN
Andritz Küsters GmbH
Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1
47805 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Henseler, Daniela, et al
Sparing Röhl Henseler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/04]
Opponent(s)01  21.03.2007  12.12.2012  WITHDRAWN
Andritz Küsters GmbH
Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1
47805 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Henseler, Daniela, et al
Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2008/01]
Opponent(s)01  21.03.2007  30.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Andritz Küsters GmbH
Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1
47805 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Henseler, Daniela, et al
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2007/18]
Opponent(s)01  21.03.2007   
Andritz Küsters GmbH & Co. KG
Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1
47805 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Henseler, Daniela, et al
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
03.05.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.09.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.12.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.01.2013
21.12.2012Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
31.12.2012Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2013/19]
15.01.2013Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE30.10.2009
FI29.10.2012
[2013/37]
Former [2011/31]SE30.10.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2297271  (WIGGINS TEAPE LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3,8,11,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]CH601686  (ESCHER WYSS AG) [A] 1,3,7,8,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0967324  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2588293  (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI])