Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1279527 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1279527



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1696
27.06.2017 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
16.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.07.2015 English translation of the claims Opposition 8
16.07.2015 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
16.07.2015 French translation of claims Opposition 9
16.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.07.2015 Submission concerning representation Opposition 3
22.04.2015 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
22.04.2015 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
22.04.2015 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
22.04.2015 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
14.04.2015 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
11.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.04.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
02.04.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.04.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
31.03.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 19
31.03.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.03.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.03.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.03.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.03.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.03.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.03.2015 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
16.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.01.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
12.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 9
12.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 9
12.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 9
12.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 9
12.01.2015 Claims Appeal 8
12.01.2015 Claims Appeal 8
12.01.2015 Claims Appeal 8
12.01.2015 Claims Appeal 8
12.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.12.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
09.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.2014 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
27.11.2014 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
27.11.2014 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
26.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
24.11.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.11.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.11.2014 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 11
14.11.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.11.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.11.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
13.11.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.11.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
07.11.2014 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
07.11.2014 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
07.11.2014 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
04.11.2014 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
31.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
29.10.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
28.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.10.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.10.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
27.10.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.10.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
25.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.10.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
22.10.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
22.10.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
22.10.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
22.10.2014 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
14.10.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.06.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
28.06.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
18.01.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.01.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
14.01.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 6
14.01.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 1
14.01.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 1
14.01.2013 Claims Appeal 9
14.01.2013 Claims Appeal 9
14.01.2013 Claims Appeal 9
14.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.01.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
07.11.2012 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
31.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.10.2012 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
01.10.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.07.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.07.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.06.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.06.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.06.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
20.06.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
19.06.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
08.05.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
27.04.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.04.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.04.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
25.04.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
28.02.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
28.02.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 28
28.02.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
28.02.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.02.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
28.02.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.12.2011 Claims Opposition 9
09.12.2011 Claims Opposition 9
09.12.2011 Claims Opposition 9
09.12.2011 Description Opposition 1
09.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 25
04.11.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.10.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.10.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.09.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.09.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.09.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.09.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
20.09.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.09.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2011 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
07.07.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
25.06.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.06.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.06.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.06.2011 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
22.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
22.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
21.06.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 15
18.03.2011 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 33
15.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
10.02.2011 Claims Appeal 9
10.02.2011 Claims Appeal 9
10.02.2011 Claims Appeal 9
10.02.2011 Claims Appeal 9
10.02.2011 Claims Appeal 9
10.02.2011 Claims Appeal 9
10.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.02.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
10.02.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
10.02.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 1
26.01.2011 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
24.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
19.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.01.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
16.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
16.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
15.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.12.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 11
23.11.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
29.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
25.07.2009 Reply to appeal Appeal 17
23.07.2009 Reply to appeal Appeal 18
29.05.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
19.05.2009 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
15.05.2009 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
14.05.2009 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.05.2009 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.05.2009 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.05.2009 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.05.2009 Reply to appeal Appeal 20
01.04.2009 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 1
22.01.2009 Submission concerning representation Appeal 2
15.01.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
14.01.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.01.2009 Claims Appeal 11
03.01.2009 Claims Appeal 11
03.01.2009 Claims Appeal 11
03.01.2009 Claims Appeal 11
03.01.2009 Claims Appeal 11
03.01.2009 Claims Appeal 11
03.01.2009 Claims Appeal 11
03.01.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
02.01.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 84
03.12.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
21.11.2008 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
06.11.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
30.10.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.10.2008 Claims Appeal 11
28.10.2008 Claims Appeal 11
28.10.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.09.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.09.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.09.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.09.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.09.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.09.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.09.2008 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
02.09.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
02.09.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.06.2008 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.06.2008 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
18.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
17.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
13.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
10.06.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.06.2008 Notice of appeal/statement of grounds Appeal 2
09.06.2008 Notice of appeal/statement of grounds Appeal 2
26.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.03.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
29.02.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.02.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
25.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.02.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
09.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.11.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2007 Claims Opposition 11
08.08.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
07.08.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
01.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.05.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.05.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.03.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.03.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.03.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.11.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.11.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.11.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.11.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.10.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
19.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2006 Request for documents Opposition 1
16.10.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 1
11.10.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 2
10.10.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 1
10.10.2006 Authorisation Opposition 1
10.10.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.10.2006 Request for transfer of rights Opposition 3
06.10.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.09.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
28.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.09.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
22.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.09.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
22.09.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
17.11.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.10.2005 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
06.10.2005 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
28.04.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.04.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 11
26.04.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.04.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 11
23.04.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
23.04.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 10
23.04.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
23.04.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 9
23.04.2005 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
03.03.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
25.02.2005 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 2
24.02.2005 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 2
25.10.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.10.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.10.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 56
13.09.2004 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.03.2004 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
16.04.2003 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
31.03.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.02.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.02.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.02.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
20.12.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
04.12.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.12.2002 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
29.10.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.10.2002 Claims Search / examination 10
29.10.2002 Description Search / examination 38
29.10.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2002 Drawings Search / examination 8
29.10.2002 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
24.03.2000 Priority document Search / examination 67