Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1308435

EP1308435 - Process for producing optically active amino alcohols [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kanto Kagaku Kabushiki Kaisha
2-8, Nihonbashihon-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2005/52]
Former [2003/19]For all designated states
Kanto Kagaku Kabushiki Kaisha
2-8, Nihonbashihon-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Watanabe, Masahito
Kanto Kagaku K.K. Chuokenkyusho, 1-7-1, Inari
Soka-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Murata, Kunihiko
Kanto Kagaku K.K. Chuokenkyusho, 1-7-1, Inari
Soka-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Ikariya, Takao
4-5-5-602, Tabata
Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2003/19]
Representative(s)Vossius, Volker , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Vossius, Volker , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Former [2003/19]Vossius, Volker, Dr. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date02024517.130.10.2002
[2003/19]
Priority number, dateJP2001033532231.10.2001         Original published format: JP 2001335322
JP2002025199429.08.2002         Original published format: JP 2002251994
[2003/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1308435
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1308435
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1308435
Date:28.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:C07C201/12, C07C253/30, C07C213/02
[2003/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/09]
Former [2003/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von optisch-aktiven Aminalkoholen[2003/19]
English:Process for producing optically active amino alcohols[2003/19]
French:Procédé de préparation d'amino alcools optiquement actifs[2003/19]
Examination procedure24.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/47]
24.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2005Fee for grant paid
17.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/50]
Former [2007/38]IT28.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[PY]EP1174426  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [PY] 1-11 * examples 11,45-52; claim 4 *;
 [DY]WO0059885  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [DY] 1-11;
 [YD]WO0007976  (SEPRACOR INC [US]) [YD] 1-11 * claims 1-8 *
 [Y]  NOYORI R., HASHIGUCHI S., "Asymmetric Transfer Hydrogenation Catalyzed by Chiral Ruthenium Complexes", ACCOUNTS OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 97 - 102, XP002229949 [Y] 1-11 * example 13 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ar9502341
 [Y]  SOLLADIÉ-CAVALLO A. ET AL., "Asymmetric Synthesis of Ephedrine Analogs", JOURNAL OR ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (19970825), vol. 330, no. 3, pages 357 - 363, XP009005021 [Y] 1-11 * page 358; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(00)99049-1
 [PLX]  WATANABE M. ET AL., "Practical Synthesis of Optically Active Amino Alcohols via Asymmetric Transfer Hydrogenation of Functionalized Aromatic Ketones", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20020208), vol. 67, no. 5, pages 1712 - 1715, XP002229950 [PLX] 1-11 * examples 2A,2C,2D,2E *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo011076w
 [Y]  DAVID MITCHELL ET AL, "Synthesis of R- and S- Fluoxetine, Norfluoxetine and related compounds from styrene oxide", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., BASEL, CH, (1995), vol. 25, no. 8, ISSN 0039-7911, pages 1231 - 1238, XP002122008 [Y] 1-11 * examples 4,5 *