Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318650

EP1318650 - Foldable phone with detachable display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ikeuchi, Shinji
Nec Corporation, 5-7-1, Shiba
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2003/24]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date02024547.804.11.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateJP2001034716813.11.2001         Original published format: JP 2001347168
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1318650
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1318650
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318650
Date:09.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/02
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/11]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Klapptelefon mit abnehmbarem Display[2004/44]
English:Foldable phone with detachable display[2003/24]
French:Téléphone pliable avec affichage détachable[2003/24]
Former [2003/24]Klapptelefon mit abnehmbaren Display
Examination procedure09.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/28]
13.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2004Fee for grant paid
12.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US6115618  (LEBBY MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 10 - line 22 * * column 1, line 35 - line 58 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 60 *;
 [X]US5196991  (HSIEH LA-FAI [TW]) [X] 1-3,7-11 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 1, line 55 - line 68 * * column 2, line 19 - line 51 *;
 [A]US5636275  (TAKAGI HISAMITSU [JP], et al) [A] * figures 36A,36B,36C,37 *;
 [A]DE19950006  (RFI ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] * figures 2,3 *