Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317120

EP1317120 - Transmission of call-related data in a CTI communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.06.2012
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2012Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.07.2012  [2012/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Enterprise Communications GmbH & Co. KG
Hofmannstrasse 51
81379 München / DE
[2011/19]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Marschall, Andreas
Brunostrasse 41
45130 Essen / DE
02 / Schroeter, Otto
Hochfeldstrasse 164
45307 Essen / DE
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Fritzsche, Thomas , et al
Fritzsche Patent
Naupliastraße 110
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/22]Fritzsche, Thomas , et al
Fritzsche Patent Naupliastrasse 110
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date02024603.904.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateDE200115874830.11.2001         Original published format: DE 10158748
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1317120
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1317120
Date:09.06.2004
[2004/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/42
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/09]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Übermittlung Call-bezogener Daten in einem CTI-Kommunikationssystem[2003/23]
English:Transmission of call-related data in a CTI communication system[2003/23]
French:Transmission de données relatives aux appels dans un système de communication ITO[2003/23]
Examination procedure17.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/29]
23.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/29]
25.11.2011Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/29]
Appeal following examination18.06.2009Appeal received No.  T1611/09
23.07.2009Statement of grounds filed
25.11.2011Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
25.11.2011Date of oral proceedings
09.12.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
29.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
28.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0847178  (IBM [US]) [X] 1 * column 13, lines 26-47 * [Y] 2-11;
 [Y]EP0721266  (NCR INT INC [US]) [Y] 2-6,11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6252947  (DIAMOND DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 7-10 * column 6, line 40 - column 8, line 11 * * column 20, line 42 - column 21, line 64; figure 10 *;
 [A]EP1001589  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-6,11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] *
 [A]  NetWare Telephony Services Application Programming Interface (TSAPI) Version 2, Issue 3.0, NOVELL; LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, XP002267338 [A] 1-6,11 * figures 2-1 * * Kapitel 3 TSAPI Call Modell *
by applicantEP0847178