Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316370

EP1316370 - Roll arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.11.2006
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2013Change - inventorpublished on 01.01.2014  [2014/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS Meer GmbH
Ohlerkirchweg 66
41069 Mönchengladbach / DE
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Bulert, Siegmund
Im Hölken 52 b
42279 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Diel, Hartmut
Rönneter 48
41068 Mönchengladbach / DE
03 / Ingelhorst, Wolfgang
Friedhofstrasse 85
45478 Mülheim / DE
04 / Lemke, Jürgen, Dr.
Ludwigsluster Strasse 47
19294 Malliss / DE
 [2014/01]
Former [2003/23]01 / Bulert, Siegmund
Im Hölken 52 b
42279 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Diel, Hartmut
Rönneter 48
41068 Mönchengladbach / DE
03 / Ingelhorst, Wolfgang
Friedhofstrasse 85
45478 Mülheim / DE
04 / Ingelhorst, Wolfgang
Friedhofstrasse 85
45478 Mülheim / DE
05 / Lemke, Jürgen, Dr.
Ludwigsluster Strasse 47
19294 Malliss / DE
Representative(s)Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger , et al
Gihske Grosse Klüppel Kross
Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten
Hammerstrasse 3
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/50]Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger , et al
Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 3
57072 Siegen / DE
Former [2003/23]Valentin, Ekkehard
Patentanwälte Grosse-Valentin-Gihske ,Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
Application number, filing date02024781.307.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateDE200115915501.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10159155
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316370
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1316370
Date:28.09.2005
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:B21B27/02
[2003/23]
Designated contracting states[2006/23]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Walzenanordnung[2003/23]
English:Roll arrangement[2003/23]
French:Agencement de cylindres[2003/23]
Examination procedure07.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/50]
26.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.05.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006DE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.05.2006M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH06277723  ;
 [XA]JPH0739913  ;
 [XA]DE4442568  (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,9,10,12-14 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8,11;
 [A]JPH0732014  ;
 [DA]EP0346880  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [DA] 1,6,7,9,10,12-14 * Spalte 4, Zeile 19 - Spalte 8, Zeile 30; Spalte 9, Zeile 48 - Spalte 10, Zeile 11; Abbildungen 2,3,6a,6b,7 *;
 [DA]EP0509136  (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP], et al) [DA] 1,9,12-14 * column 4, line 52 - column 11, line 22; figure - *;
 [A]EP0593142  (MANNESMANN AG [DE])
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, [X] 1-3,9,12-14 * abstract * [A] 4-8,10,11
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, [X] 1,3,9,12-14 * abstract * [A] 2,4-8,10,11
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, [A] 1,7-14 * abstract *