Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1311048

EP1311048 - Power controller, power generation system and control method of power controller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.05.2006  [2006/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyauchi, Shinji
607-3, Yao, Tawaramotocho
Shikigun, Nara 636-0311 / JP
02 / Ueda, Tetsuya
1-15-28, Takamoridai
Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-0032 / JP
03 / Ozeki, Masataka
5-21-1-304, Fuchucho
Izumi-shi, Osaka 594-0071 / JP
04 / Zimbo, Hiroyuki
Grace Naka-iwata 203, 5-6-18, Iwata
Toyohashi-shi, Aichi 440-0832 / JP
05 / Koike, Kiichi
1460-29, Yamanishi, Ninomiyacyo
Nakagun, Kanagawa 259-0124 / JP
 [2003/20]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02024975.107.11.2002
[2003/20]
Priority number, dateJP2001034508909.11.2001         Original published format: JP 2001345089
[2003/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1311048
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1311048
Date:16.02.2005
[2005/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2005
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00, H01M16/00
[2003/20]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2005/44]
Former [2003/20]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Leistungssteuerung, Energieerzeugungssystem und Verfahren zur Steurung von Leistung[2003/20]
English:Power controller, power generation system and control method of power controller[2003/20]
French:Dispositif pour le réglage de puissance, système de production d'énergie et procédé pour le control du dispositif de réglage[2003/20]
Examination procedure17.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/20]
14.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.09.2005DE   M01   Not yet paid
22.09.2005FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.09.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.09.2005M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4860185  (BREWER DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9 * abstract * * figures 1,5,17 * [Y] 5,8,10;
 [Y]US4670702  (YAMADA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6216956  (EHLERS GREGORY A [US], et al) [Y] 8,10 * abstract * * figure 4 *;
 [A]  - SUKUMARA G V ET AL, "Fuel cell based uninterrupted power sources", POWER ELECTRONICS AND DRIVE SYSTEMS, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., 1997 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SINGAPORE 26-29 MAY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970526), ISBN 0-7803-3773-5, pages 728 - 733, XP010244589 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 729 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PEDS.1997.627449