Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318435

EP1318435 - Heater member with an over coat including cured fluorocarbon thermoplastic random copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.12.2013
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.01.2014  [2014/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2004/44]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
NexPress Solutions LLC
1447 St. Paul Street
Rochester, NY 14653-7103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Boulatnikov, Nataly
202 Applegrove Drive
Rochester, NY 14612 / US
02 / Chen, Jiann-Hsing
11 Cambray Drive
Fairport, NY 14450 / US
03 / Ciaschi, Andrew
2695 Pond Road
Lima, NY 14485 / US
04 / Pavlisko, Joseph A.
433 West Bloomfield Road
Pittsford, NY 14534 / US
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Klang, Alexander H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[2013/33]
Former [2009/10]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2004/52]Haile, Helen Cynthia , et al
Kodak Limited Patent Department, W92-3A, Headstone Drive
Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB
Former [2003/24]Franzen, Peter , et al
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Application number, filing date02025095.713.11.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateUS2001001138804.12.2001         Original published format: US 11388
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318435
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/20
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/24]
TitleGerman:Heizelement mit einer Oberschicht beinhaltend gehärtetes thermoplastisches statistisches Fluorkohlenstoffcopolymer[2003/24]
English:Heater member with an over coat including cured fluorocarbon thermoplastic random copolymer[2003/24]
French:Elément de chauffage avec une couche supérieure utilisant un copolymère thermoplastique vulcanisé statistique de fluorcarbone[2003/24]
Examination procedure11.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
22.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/02]
26.08.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/02]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.04.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
06.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[Y]US6061545  (CERRAH KEN M [US]) [Y] 1-47 * column 4, line 61 - column 8, line 15 *;
 [Y]US6096429  (CHEN JIANN-HSING [US], et al) [Y] 1-47 * column 6, line 4 - column 11, line 34 *
by applicantUS6061545
 US20000500826
 US20000501459