Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318185

EP1318185 - Reactive mesogenic azulenes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
MERCK PATENT GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Farrand, Louise
3 Gallop Cottages, Spetisbury
Blandford Forum, Dorset, DT11 9ED / GB
02 / Findlater, Michael
2 Castle Way, Bargeddie
Glasgow, G69 7QG / GB
03 / Giles, Mark
Flat 17, Locksley Court, 24-26 Archers Road
Southampton, SO15 2LE / GB
04 / Heeney, Martin
59 Cedar Rd.
Southampton, SO14 6TQ / GB
05 / Tierney, Steven
35 Bellemoor Road
Southamton SO15 7QW / GB
06 / Thompson, Marcus
6, Riverside Place
Fordingbridge, Hampshire, SP6 1RR / GB
07 / Shkunov, Maxim
9 Ivy Lodge, 48 Seagarth Lane
Southampton, SO16 6SX / GB
08 / Sparrowe, David
21a Castlemain Avenue, Southbourne
Bournemouth, Dorset, BH6 5EJ / GB
09 / McCulloch, Iain
Brookvale Muss Lane, Kings Somborne
Hampshire, SO20 6PE / GB
 [2003/24]
Application number, filing date02025130.209.11.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateEP2001012921710.12.2001         Original published format: EP 01129217
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318185
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318185
Date:16.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:C09K19/32
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/24]
TitleGerman:Reaktive mesogene Azulene[2003/24]
English:Reactive mesogenic azulenes[2003/24]
French:Azulènes mésogéniques réactifs[2003/24]
Examination procedure09.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/24]
27.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2004Fee for grant paid
15.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.02.2005
BE16.02.2005
BG16.02.2005
CH16.02.2005
CZ16.02.2005
EE16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
LI16.02.2005
SK16.02.2005
TR16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
GR16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
PT04.08.2005
CY09.11.2005
IE09.11.2005
[2007/20]
Former [2007/11]AT16.02.2005
BE16.02.2005
BG16.02.2005
CH16.02.2005
CZ16.02.2005
EE16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
LI16.02.2005
SK16.02.2005
TR16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
GR16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
PT04.08.2005
IE09.11.2005
Former [2006/52]AT16.02.2005
BE16.02.2005
BG16.02.2005
CH16.02.2005
CZ16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
LI16.02.2005
SK16.02.2005
TR16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
GR16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
PT04.08.2005
IE09.11.2005
Former [2006/48]AT16.02.2005
BE16.02.2005
BG16.02.2005
CH16.02.2005
CZ16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
LI16.02.2005
SK16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
GR16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
PT04.08.2005
IE09.11.2005
Former [2006/15]AT16.02.2005
BE16.02.2005
BG16.02.2005
CH16.02.2005
CZ16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
LI16.02.2005
SK16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
GR16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
PT04.08.2005
Former [2006/14]AT16.02.2005
BE16.02.2005
BG16.02.2005
CH16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
LI16.02.2005
SK16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
GR16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
PT04.08.2005
Former [2006/12]AT16.02.2005
BE16.02.2005
BG16.02.2005
CH16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
LI16.02.2005
SK16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
Former [2006/01]AT16.02.2005
BE16.02.2005
BG16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
SK16.02.2005
SE16.05.2005
Former [2005/51]AT16.02.2005
BE16.02.2005
BG16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
SE16.05.2005
Former [2005/48]BG16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
SE16.05.2005
Former [2005/46]BG16.02.2005
FI16.02.2005
Former [2005/30]BG16.02.2005
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH0269441  ;
 [DA]JPH0269437  ;
 [DA]JPH03122189  ;
 [DA]WO9700600  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-3 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0187015  (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [A]JPH0269439  ;
 [A]JPH0269438  ;
 [A]JPS60104180  ;
 [E]EP1256602  (ROLIC AG [CH]) [E] 1 * page 5, paragraph 15; claim - *;
 [A]US4738908  (OGUCHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900529), vol. 014, no. 250, Database accession no. (C - 0723), [DA] 1-17 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910819), vol. 015, no. 324, Database accession no. (C - 0859), [DA] 1-17 * abstract *
 [A]  - ESTDALE S E ET AL, "THE AZULENE RING AS A STRUCTURAL ELEMENT IN LIQUID CRYSTALS", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19970301), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 0959-9428, pages 391 - 401, XP000693112 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a606139g
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900529), vol. 014, no. 250, Database accession no. (C - 0723), [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851003), vol. 009, no. 247, Database accession no. (C - 307), [A] 1-10 * abstract *
Examination   - WADA E. ET AL, "Synthesis and Polymerization of Acrylates Containing Azulene Structure", J.POLYM.SCI.,POLYM.CHEM.ED., (1978), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 2085 - 2087,