Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319457

EP1319457 - Method of cutting substantially cylindrical internally or externally toothed gears [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.02.2015
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2015Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 25.03.2015  [2015/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GLEASON-PFAUTER, Maschinenfabrik GmbH
Daimlerstrasse 14
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
[2008/19]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
GLEASON-PFAUTER, Maschinenfabrik GmbH
Daimlerstrasse 14
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fahrer, Siegfried
Kastenienweg 15
71726 Benningen a/.N. / DE
02 / Peiffer, Klaus, Dr.
Kirchstrasse 24
71634 Ludwigsburg / DE
03 / Faulstich, Ingo, Dr.
Mundelsheimber Strasse 10
71634 Ludwigsburg / DE
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
[2015/13]
Former [2009/19]Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Former [2003/25]Kohl, Karl-Heinz
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. A.K. Jackisch-Kohl Dipl.-Ing. K.H. Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date02025260.713.11.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateDE200116282314.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10162823
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319457
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1319457
Date:11.02.2004
[2004/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319457
Date:07.05.2008
Language:DE
[2008/19]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1319457
Date:25.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:B23F23/10
[2004/07]
Former International [2003/25]B23F17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum spanenden Bearbeiten im wesentlichen zylindrischer, innen- oder aussenverzahnter Zahnräder[2003/25]
English:Method of cutting substantially cylindrical internally or externally toothed gears[2003/25]
French:Procédé d'usinage de roues dentées essentiellement cylindriques à denture intérieure ou extérieure[2003/25]
Examination procedure10.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/41]
14.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2008Fee for grant paid
19.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009  18.02.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Höfler Maschinenbau GmbH
Industriestrasse 19
76275 Ettlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Mischung, Ralf, et al
Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Elisabethstrasse 34/II
80796 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/12]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009   
Höfler Maschinenbau GmbH
Industriestrasse 19
76275 Ettlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Mischung, Ralf, et al
Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
13.03.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.09.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.12.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.11.2014Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.01.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
09.02.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition24.02.2011Appeal received No.  T0531/11
26.04.2011Statement of grounds filed
28.11.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
28.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
08.12.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
SE07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
LU13.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
AT13.11.2009
[2010/47]
Former [2010/37]CY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
SE07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
LU13.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
AT13.11.2009
Former [2010/34]CY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
SE07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
LU13.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/32]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
SE07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
LU13.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/29]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
SE07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/23]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
SE07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/13]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/12]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/08]DK07.05.2008
IE07.05.2008
NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
Former [2009/07]NL07.05.2008
SE07.08.2008
Former [2008/49]NL07.05.2008
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3712454  (WERKZEUGMASCH OKT VEB [DD]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6;
 [XA]DE19631620  (DICK ALBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-6;
 [A]  - SPUR G ET AL, "RECHNERUNTERSTUETZTE FEHLERKOMPENSATION AN CNC-SCHLEIFMASCHINEN", ZWF ZEITSCHRIFT FUR WIRTSCHAFTLICHE FERTIGUNG UND AUTOMATISIERUNG, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19930901), vol. 88, no. 9, ISSN 0947-0085, pages 375 - 377, XP000396519 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
OppositionDE1943558
    - "SINUMERIK 840D/840Di" Funktionsbeschreibung der Firma Siemens (Ausgabe 10.2000),
    - I. N. BRONSTEIN ET AL., Taschenbuch der Mathematik, FRANKFURT/MAIN, VERLAG HARRI DEUTSCH, vol. 19, pages 266 - 269,
    - "Raum- oder Gelenkkoordinaten - Konvertierungsalgorithmen von Orientierungsbeschreibungen", ZENTRALSCHWEIZERISCHEN TECHNIKUMS LUZERN, (199501), pages 1 - 3,
    - W. LOTZE, Zahnradmessung mit Koordinatenmessgeräten, pages 14,89 - 114,115,
    - Pfauter presents a new generation of CNC Profile Grinding Machines,
    - Zahnrad-Profilschleifmaschinen ZP 06 / ZP 08, vierseitiger Firmenprospekt der Firma Niles, Berlin, mit Angebotsunterlagen aus dem Jahr 1999 und einer Referenzliste,
    - Angebotsschreiben der Einsprechenden vom 18. Oktober 2001 mit Zeichnung als Anlage für eine Promat 700S,
    - Maschinenbedienung, 5.3 Prozess-Menü, Bedienungsanleitung der Einsprechenden fürdie Maschine Promat 700S, nachveröffentlicht,
    - Maschinenbedienung, 5.2 Datenverwaltungs-Menü, Bedienungsanleitung der Einsprechenden für die Maschine Promat 700S, nachveröffentlicht,
    - Helix 400 / Promat 400, Ausführungsvarianten, Standard und kk, Firmenprospekt der Einsprechenden, nachveröffentlicht 4/2005,
    - Helix 700, Ausführungsvarianten Promat, Standard und kk, Firmenprospekt der Einsprechenden, nachveröffentlicht 4/2005,
    - Fräsen von Turbinenschaufen mit Siemens 840D Präsentation eines Applikationsprojekts bei den Firmen Dr. Hagen / Lappersdorf und GEC ALSTHOM / Nürnberg vom 05.06.1996,