Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1319457 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1319457



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 790
25.03.2015 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
09.02.2015 English translation of the claims Opposition 2
09.02.2015 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
09.02.2015 French translation of claims Opposition 2
09.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
30.01.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
20.01.2015 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
20.01.2015 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
14.01.2015 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 4
05.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
24.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.12.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.12.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 19
08.12.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
28.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.11.2014 Claims Appeal 3
28.11.2014 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
21.11.2014 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 4
04.11.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.2014 Drawings Appeal 1
28.10.2014 Drawings Appeal 1
28.10.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.10.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.09.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
18.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.09.2014 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
13.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.09.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.09.2014 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
10.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.09.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
09.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.09.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.09.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
04.09.2014 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
02.09.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.09.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.03.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.12.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
04.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.11.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.06.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.05.2012 Claims Appeal 2
29.05.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
16.03.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
14.03.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
10.11.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.10.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
21.09.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
07.09.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.08.2011 Reply to appeal Appeal 4
12.05.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.05.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.04.2011 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.04.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
11.03.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
08.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.02.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.02.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
15.12.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.12.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
15.12.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
15.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.12.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Drawings Opposition 4
22.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 23
04.06.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.05.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.05.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.05.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
25.05.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
25.05.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
20.07.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.07.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
07.04.2009 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
07.04.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
26.03.2009 Authorisation Opposition 1
26.03.2009 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Opposition 1
19.03.2009 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
13.03.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.03.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.02.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 79
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
09.02.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
09.02.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
09.02.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
09.02.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.02.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
09.02.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
10.04.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.03.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.03.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.03.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
30.11.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.11.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.11.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
08.11.2007 Claims Search / examination 5
08.11.2007 Description Search / examination 3
08.11.2007 Drawings Search / examination 1
08.11.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.09.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.09.2007 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.09.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.09.2007 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
22.05.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
13.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
13.03.2006 Description Search / examination 6
13.03.2006 Drawings Search / examination 4
13.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
16.01.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.01.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.09.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
14.09.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.08.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
10.08.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.02.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.12.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
30.12.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.12.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
08.05.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
21.01.2003 Authorisation Search / examination 1
21.01.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.01.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2002 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 1
29.11.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
29.11.2002 Priority document Search / examination 30
13.11.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.11.2002 Authorisation Search / examination 1
13.11.2002 Claims Search / examination 6
13.11.2002 Description Search / examination 14
13.11.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2002 Drawings Search / examination 8
13.11.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6