Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316411

EP1316411 - Rotor for tabletting press [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
24.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fette Compacting GmbH
Grabauer Strasse 24
21493 Schwarzenbek / DE
[2012/42]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Fette GmbH
Grabauer Strasse 24
21493 Schwarzenbek / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hinzpeter, Jürgen
Aubenas Strasse 15
21493 Schwarzenbek / DE
02 / Zeuschner, Ulrich
Elbinger Strasse 4
21493 Schwarzenbek / DE
03 / Lüneburg, Peter
Kirchenstrasse 22
23919 Berkenthin / DE
04 / Arndt, Ulrich
Sonnental 1
21481 Lauenburg/Elbe / DE
05 / Wolf, Hans
Gerstenweg 2
21493 Schwarzenbek / DE
06 / Rau, Matthias
Dorfstrasse 12
21521 Dassendorf / DE
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/39]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2003/23]Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg
Neuer Wall 41
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date02025449.615.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateDE2001105911401.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10159114
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316411
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1316411
Date:21.01.2004
[2004/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316411
Date:26.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:B30B11/08
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/23]
TitleGerman:Rotor für eine Tablettenpresse[2003/23]
English:Rotor for tabletting press[2003/23]
French:Rotor pour une presse à comprimés[2003/23]
Examination procedure13.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/07]
09.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
31.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2012
26.06.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
16.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2012Fee for grant paid
07.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.08.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.04.2013  25.06.2014  WITHDRAWN
Notter GmbH Werkzeugbau
Erlen 10
75248 Ölbronn-Dürrn / DE
Opponent's representative
Leitner, Waldemar, et al
Patentanwalt Dr. techn. Waldemar Leitner
Zerrennerstrasse 23-25
75172 Pforzheim / DE
 02  17.06.2013  24.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Elizabeth Europe
Rue Emile Roux
Zone Industrielle les Gailletrous
41260 La Chaussée Saint-Victor / FR
Opponent's representative
Ipside
29, rue de Lisbonne
75008 Paris / FR
 03  26.06.2013  04.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Korsch AG
Breitenbachstr. 1
13509 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Kurfürstendamm 54/55
10707 Berlin / DE
 [2018/21]
Former [2016/45]
Opponent(s)01  04.04.2013  25.06.2014  WITHDRAWN
Notter GmbH Werkzeugbau
Erlen 10
75248 Ölbronn-Dürrn / DE
Opponent's representative
Leitner, Waldemar, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 10 12 60
75112 Pforzheim / DE
 02  17.06.2013  24.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Elizabeth Europe
Rue Emile Roux
Zone Industrielle les Gailletrous
41260 La Chaussée Saint-Victor / FR
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Alain
Cabinet Malemont
91 avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
 03  26.06.2013  04.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Korsch AG
Breitenbachstr. 1
13509 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Kurfürstendamm 54/55
10707 Berlin / DE
Former [2014/31]
Opponent(s)01  04.04.2013  25.06.2014  WITHDRAWN
Notter GmbH Werkzeugbau
Erlen 10
75248 Ölbronn-Dürrn / DE
Opponent's representative
Leitner, Waldemar, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 10 12 60
75112 Pforzheim / DE
 02  17.06.2013  24.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Elizabeth Europe
Rue Emile Roux
Zone Industrielle les Gailletrous
41260 La Chaussée Saint-Victor / FR
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Alain
Cabinet Malemont
91 avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
 03  26.06.2013  04.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Korsch AG
Breitenbachstr. 1
13509 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Lange, Sven, et al
Hertin und Partner
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Kurfürstendamm 54/55
10707 Berlin / DE
Former [2013/32]
Opponent(s)01  04.04.2013  12.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Notter GmbH Werkzeugbau
Erlen 10
75248 Ölbronn-Dürrn / DE
Opponent's representative
Leitner, Waldemar, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 10 12 60
75112 Pforzheim / DE
 02  17.06.2013  24.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Elizabeth Europe
Rue Emile Roux
Zone Industrielle les Gailletrous
41260 La Chaussée Saint-Victor / FR
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Alain
Cabinet Malemont
42, avenue du Président Wilson
75116 Paris / FR
 03  26.06.2013  04.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Korsch AG
Breitenbachstr. 1
13509 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Lange, Sven, et al
Hertin Anwaltssozietät Kurfürstendamm 54-55
10707 Berlin / DE
Former [2013/30]
Opponent(s)01  04.04.2013  12.04.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Notter GmbH Werkzeugbau
Erlen 10
75248 Ölbronn-Dürrn / DE
Opponent's representative
Leitner, Waldemar, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 10 12 60
75112 Pforzheim / DE
 02  17.06.2013   
Elizabeth Europe
Rue Emile Roux
Zone Industrielle les Gailletrous
41260 La Chaussée Saint-Victor / FR
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann, Alain
Cabinet Malemont
42, avenue du Président Wilson
75116 Paris / FR
Former [2013/20]
Opponent(s)01  04.04.2013   
Notter GmbH Werkzeugbau
Erlen 10
75248 Ölbronn-Dürrn / DE
Opponent's representative
Leitner, Waldemar, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 10 12 60
75112 Pforzheim / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
31.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.02.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
29.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.10.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition22.12.2015Appeal received No.  T2372/15
29.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
13.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
31.05.2011Request for further processing filed
31.05.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.06.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
16.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
17.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
19.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
MC30.11.2012
BG26.12.2012
[2014/21]
Former [2013/34]CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH10305395  ;
 [X]JPH05131294  ;
 [X]DD225851  (MANN WOLFGANG, et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-3; claim - *;
 [A]EP0963836  (BONALS S A J [ES]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 30 - line 37 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10305395 A 19981117 (MURATA MFG CO LTD;KIKUSUI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [X] 1-5 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930910), vol. 017, no. 503, Database accession no. (M - 1478), & JP05131294 A 19930528 (TDK CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
by applicantJPH10305395