Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316350

EP1316350 - Process and device for purifying fermentation gases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.10.2005  [2005/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
Siloxa Engineering AG
Katernberger Strasse 107
45327 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
Siloxa Engineering AG
Katernberger Strasse 107
45327 Essen / DE
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
For all designated states
Siloxa Engineering AG
Katernberger Strasse 107
45327 Essen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schwerdt, Peter, Dipl.Ing.
Biberweg 2
46535 Dinslaken / DE
02 / Doczyck, Wolfgang, Dipl.Ing.
Kärtner Strasse 42
46047 Oberhausen / DE
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Gagel, Roland
Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel
Landsberger Strasse 480a
81241 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Gagel, Roland, Dr.
Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel, Landsberger Strasse 480a
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date02025665.720.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateDE200115880430.11.2001         Original published format: DE 10158804
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316350
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/14, B01D53/86
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/23]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anlage zur Reinigung von Faulgasen[2003/23]
English:Process and device for purifying fermentation gases[2003/23]
French:Installation et procédé pour l'épuration des gaz de fermentation[2003/23]
Examination procedure20.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/47]
07.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/42]
29.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/42]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0955352  (HAASE ENERGIETECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE19810993  (DOCZYCK WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 24 - line 66 *;
 [A]DE10008247  (SCHULZE OSWALD KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 *