blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1283036 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1283036



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2184
30.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 26
23.04.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 2
23.04.2019 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.04.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.04.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
04.04.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.03.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
24.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.01.2019 Amended description with annotations Opposition 25
24.01.2019 Description Opposition 24
24.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.01.2019 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
26.11.2018 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
26.11.2018 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
26.11.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.09.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 21
28.09.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.08.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.08.2018 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
20.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
19.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.07.2018 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
19.07.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 2
10.07.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.07.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 14
06.07.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 14
28.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.06.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.05.2018 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
07.05.2018 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
02.05.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
03.04.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
26.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 8
26.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
26.03.2018 Claims Appeal 8
26.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.03.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.03.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 24
26.03.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2018 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 1
19.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.12.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
14.12.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
11.12.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
16.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
28.07.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
25.07.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.07.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
19.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.01.2017 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 1
03.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.11.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
23.11.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
23.11.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
23.11.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
17.11.2016 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
10.11.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
31.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
25.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.10.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.09.2016 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 1
13.09.2016 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 1
08.09.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
05.09.2016 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
20.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.06.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
13.05.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
13.05.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
13.05.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
04.05.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 1
01.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
24.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
14.12.2015 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Appeal 1
26.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
17.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.12.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.10.2014 Request for change of representative Appeal 1
23.09.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 6
11.03.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
31.01.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
04.07.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.07.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.06.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
02.05.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
25.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.04.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
25.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.04.2012 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
24.04.2012 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 3
19.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.04.2012 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
19.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.04.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
17.04.2012 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
16.01.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
21.12.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
21.12.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
21.12.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
19.12.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
14.12.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 31
14.12.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 31
14.12.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 31
10.10.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
05.10.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.09.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.09.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
08.09.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.09.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.08.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.08.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
15.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.08.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
15.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.08.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 3
10.08.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.08.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
04.08.2011 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
04.08.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
04.08.2011 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
04.08.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
04.08.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.07.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2009 Claims Opposition 3
22.12.2009 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 8
13.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.10.2009 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
07.10.2009 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 7
05.10.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.10.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
12.06.2009 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
02.06.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 174
02.06.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 126
02.06.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.06.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
29.05.2009 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
26.05.2009 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
25.05.2009 Claims Opposition 2
25.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
25.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 300
25.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.05.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 22
19.05.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.05.2009 Claims Opposition 2
19.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
19.05.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 23
04.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
28.02.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.02.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
10.11.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.11.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.11.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.10.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
06.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
06.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
06.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
06.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
06.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
06.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
06.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 108
06.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.10.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
02.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
02.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 74
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 88
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.10.2008 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
30.09.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 20
30.09.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.09.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.09.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
29.03.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
06.12.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.11.2007 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
08.11.2007 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
08.11.2007 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
26.09.2007 Description Search / examination 1
26.09.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.09.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.09.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
21.09.2007 Description Search / examination 1
21.09.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
21.09.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
21.09.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
21.09.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.05.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.05.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.05.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
10.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
10.03.2007 Description Search / examination 14
10.03.2007 Description Search / examination 6
10.03.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.03.2007 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.03.2007 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.03.2007 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
07.03.2007 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
07.03.2007 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.03.2007 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.01.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
16.01.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
16.01.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
12.01.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
12.01.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
12.01.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
12.01.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
12.01.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.01.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.12.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.12.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.12.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.12.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.12.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
13.12.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
13.12.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.12.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.12.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.12.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 5
04.12.2006 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
04.12.2006 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.12.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
04.12.2006 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
01.12.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.11.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
14.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
14.03.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
10.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
10.03.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
11.11.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
11.11.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.01.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
10.01.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.01.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.11.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.11.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.11.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
03.07.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.07.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.04.2003 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.02.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.01.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.12.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
13.12.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.12.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
18.11.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.11.2002 Claims Search / examination 7
18.11.2002 Description Search / examination 29
18.11.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.11.2002 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
18.11.2002 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
30.05.2000 Priority document Search / examination 28