Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316479

EP1316479 - Bumper support and bumper for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dynamit Nobel Kunststoff GmbH
Jahnstrasse 18
91781 Weissenburg / DE
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Burkhardt, Steffen
Ahornweg 4
71083 Herrenberg / DE
02 / Preissler, Dietmar
Felchbachweg 3
91781 Hagenbuch / DE
03 / Sautner, Anton
Schlesierstrasse 4
91757 Treuchtlingen / DE
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Scherzberg, Andreas Hans , et al
Chemetall GmbH
Patente, Marken & Lizenzen
Trakehner Strasse 3
60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Scherzberg, Andreas Hans , et al
Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3
60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2003/23]Scherzberg, Andreas, Dr. , et al
c/o Dynamit Nobel AG -Patente, Marken & Lizenzen-
53839 Troisdorf / DE
Application number, filing date02025802.618.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateDE200115748123.11.2001         Original published format: DE 10157481
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316479
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1316479
Date:09.06.2004
[2004/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:B60R19/24, B60R19/34
[2004/22]
Former International [2003/23]B60R19/24
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2005/09]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Stossfängerhalter und Stossfänger für Kraftfahrzeuge[2003/23]
English:Bumper support and bumper for vehicles[2003/23]
French:Support de pare-chocs et pare-chocs pour véhicules automobiles[2003/23]
Examination procedure09.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/06]
02.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/23]
20.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE4401865  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 36-43; figure 7 * [Y] 6,7;
 [X]JPH08276804  ;
 [X]US6174009  (MCKEON R CLAYTON [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE19700022  (BALL WILFRIED [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 20; figure FIGUR *;
 [DY]DE1289441  (PORSCHE KG) [DY] 6,7 * column 1, paragraph L - column 2, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]EP0418923  (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) [A] * abstract *;
 [PX]US2002101085  (GEHRINGHOFF LUDGER [DE], et al) [PX] 1,4-7 * paragraphs [0018] , [0041] - [0048]; figures 1-3 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, [X] 1 * abstract *