Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315341

EP1315341 - Receiver polling for data transmission with sliding window data flow control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  18.03.2011
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2011Revocation of patentpublished on 20.04.2011  [2011/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku
Seoul / KR
[N/P]
Former [2007/04]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Ku
Seoul / KR
Former [2003/22]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Ku
Seoul / KR
Inventor(s)01 / YI, Seung-June
Daechung Apt.303-403, Kaepo-Dong, Kangnam-Ku
Seoul / KR
02 / Yeo, Woon-Young
Satbyul Apt.612-1107, 1109-4,Bisan-Dong, Dongan-Ku
Anyang, Kyungki-do / KR
03 / Lee, So-Young
Twikye 2-Cha Apt.366-702, Okeum-Dong, Kunpo
Kyungki-Do / KR
 [2003/22]
Representative(s)Urner, Peter
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]Urner, Peter, Dipl.-Phys.
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date02025824.018.11.2002
[2003/22]
Priority number, dateKR2001007364224.11.2001         Original published format: KR 2001073642
[2003/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315341
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315341
Date:24.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2003/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/22]
TitleGerman:Empfängerabfrage für eine Datenübertragung mit Gleitfenster-Datenflusssteuerung[2003/22]
English:Receiver polling for data transmission with sliding window data flow control[2003/22]
French:Interrogation de recepteur pour transmission de données avec commande de flux de données par fenêtre glissante[2003/22]
Examination procedure30.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
30.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
16.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2006Fee for grant paid
13.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.10.2007   
Telefonaktiebolaget L- M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.2007   
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2007/49]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.2007   
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
28.11.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.09.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.10.2010Date of oral proceedings
28.10.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/16]
29.11.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.11.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE24.01.2007
CH24.01.2007
CY24.01.2007
CZ24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
EE24.01.2007
LI24.01.2007
SK24.01.2007
TR24.01.2007
BG25.04.2007
GR25.04.2007
PT25.06.2007
LU18.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]BE24.01.2007
CH24.01.2007
CY24.01.2007
CZ24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
EE24.01.2007
LI24.01.2007
SK24.01.2007
BG25.04.2007
GR25.04.2007
PT25.06.2007
LU18.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2009/33]BE24.01.2007
CH24.01.2007
CY24.01.2007
CZ24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
EE24.01.2007
LI24.01.2007
SK24.01.2007
BG25.04.2007
GR25.04.2007
PT25.06.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2009/10]BE24.01.2007
CH24.01.2007
CZ24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
EE24.01.2007
LI24.01.2007
SK24.01.2007
BG25.04.2007
GR25.04.2007
PT25.06.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2008/29]BE24.01.2007
CH24.01.2007
CZ24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
LI24.01.2007
SK24.01.2007
BG25.04.2007
GR25.04.2007
PT25.06.2007
MC30.11.2007
Former [2008/20]BE24.01.2007
CH24.01.2007
CZ24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
LI24.01.2007
SK24.01.2007
BG25.04.2007
GR25.04.2007
PT25.06.2007
Former [2008/01]BE24.01.2007
CH24.01.2007
CZ24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
LI24.01.2007
SK24.01.2007
BG25.04.2007
PT25.06.2007
Former [2007/51]CH24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
LI24.01.2007
SK24.01.2007
BG25.04.2007
PT25.06.2007
Former [2007/46]CH24.01.2007
DK24.01.2007
LI24.01.2007
BG25.04.2007
PT25.06.2007
Former [2007/38]CH24.01.2007
LI24.01.2007
BG25.04.2007
PT25.06.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0137473  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-41 * abstract * * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 17 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 27 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 42 *;
 [A]EP0695053  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-41 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 17; figure 1 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 27 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 42 *;
 [A]WO0122645  (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-41 * page 4, line 13 - page 8, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0430571  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-41 * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 55 *
 [A]  - ETSI, "Universal Mobile Telecommunication System (UMTS);RLC Protocol Specification (3G TS 25.322 version 3.1.2 Release 1999)", ETSI TS 125 322 V3.1.2, XX, XX, (1999), pages 1 - 48, XP002168713 [A] 1-41 * the whole document *
by applicantWO0137473
 EP0695053