Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318206

EP1318206 - Use of a copper-aluminium alloy with defined coatings as bearings material for the fabrication of wear resistant sliding bearings [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wieland-Werke AG
89070 Ulm / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Wieland-Werke AG
89070 Ulm / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ohla, Klaus Dr.
Hermann-Hesse-Strasse 16
89171 Illerkirchberg / DE
02 / Scharf, Michael
Alpenblick 18
89165 Dietenheim / DE
 [2003/24]
Application number, filing date02025888.520.11.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateDE200115994906.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10159949
[2003/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318206
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318206
Date:27.04.2005
Language:DE
[2005/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:C23C8/16, F16C33/04, C23C14/08, C23C16/40
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/24]
TitleGerman:Verwendung einer Kupfer-Aluminium-Legierung mit definierten Deckschichten als Lagerwerkstoff zur Herstellung von verschleissfesten Gleitlagern[2003/24]
English:Use of a copper-aluminium alloy with defined coatings as bearings material for the fabrication of wear resistant sliding bearings[2003/24]
French:Utilisation d'un alliage de cuivre et d'aluminium muni de revêtements définis comme matériau pour paliers afin de fabriquer des paliers à glissement résistants à l'usure[2003/24]
Examination procedure20.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/24]
30.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2005Fee for grant paid
15.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ27.04.2005
EE27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
SK27.04.2005
TR27.04.2005
BG27.07.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
CY20.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
[2007/20]
Former [2007/13]CZ27.04.2005
EE27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
SK27.04.2005
TR27.04.2005
BG27.07.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
BE30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/11]CZ27.04.2005
EE27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
SK27.04.2005
TR27.04.2005
BG27.07.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/52]CZ27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
SK27.04.2005
TR27.04.2005
BG27.07.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/30]CZ27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
SK27.04.2005
BG27.07.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/23]CZ27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
IE27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
BG27.07.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
Former [2006/22]CZ27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
BG27.07.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
Former [2006/15]CZ27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
BG27.07.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
Former [2006/14]FI27.04.2005
BG27.07.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
Former [2006/13]FI27.04.2005
BG27.07.2005
DK27.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI27.04.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPS59222585  ;
 [Y]JPS6019972  ;
 [Y]EP0167102  (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7,8 * page 2, lines 20-28 * * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 21 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 21; example 1 *;
 [Y]JPH04250995  ;
 [Y]DE19946018  (JUKI KK [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * column 12, lines 19-34 * * column 34, line 27 - column 35, line 37 * * column 44, lines 41-46 * * column 46, lines 34-43 *;
 [Y]US5174012  (HAMILTON HAROLD J [US]) [Y] 1 * column 6, lines 19-39; claims 10,11 *;
 [Y]JPH08261184  ;
 [A]JPH02301909
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850419), vol. 009, no. 091, Database accession no. (C - 277), [Y] 1,5,7,8 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850614), vol. 009, no. 139, Database accession no. (M - 387), [Y] 1,5,7,8,1-4,7,8 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930119), vol. 017, no. 027, Database accession no. (M - 1355), [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - REYBET DEGAT P ET AL, "Effect of chromic acid anodizing treatment on fretting behaviour during fretting tests on pre-stressed specimens", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19970420), vol. 298, no. 1-2, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 170 - 176, XP004125936 [Y] 1,1-5 * page 171, paragraphs 2-5 * * page 175, paragraphs 4-7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(96)09271-1
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910228), vol. 015, no. 086, Database accession no. (E - 1039), [A] 1-4 * abstract *