Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319344

EP1319344 - Display unit including at least one indication unit placed in the front part of its housing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.06.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.06.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.07.2006  [2006/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Tuzar, Gert-Dieter
Abt-Rottler-Strasse 40
78052 Obereschach / DE
 [2003/25]
Application number, filing date02025933.920.11.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateDE200116074911.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10160749
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319344
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/32, G01D11/24, G01D11/28, B60K35/00, B60K37/02
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   SE [2004/11]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anzeigevorrichtung mit mindestens einem in deren frontseitigem Gehäuseteil angeordneten Zeigerinstrument[2003/25]
English:Display unit including at least one indication unit placed in the front part of its housing[2003/25]
French:Unité d'affichage contenant au moins un indicateur placé sur le front de sa boîte[2003/25]
Examination procedure17.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/28]
02.03.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5971556  (CARTER JAMES C [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 60; figures 1-5 * [Y] 7-10;
 [X]EP0078372  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-17 *;
 [Y]DE19904597  (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [Y] 7-9 * column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 68; figure 4 *;
 [Y]DE19534020  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [Y] 10 * figure 1; claim 7 *;
 [A]US5744714  (WALDING JR H PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * figure 3 *