blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1422436 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1422436



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 110
12.10.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
14.01.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
30.08.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.09.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.09.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.09.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
16.07.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
16.07.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.07.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
11.05.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
11.05.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.05.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
15.04.2005 Description Search / examination 9
15.04.2005 Description Search / examination 9
15.04.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.01.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.01.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.11.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
18.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
18.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
01.06.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.04.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
10.04.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
10.04.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.04.2003 European search report Search / examination 2
25.11.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
25.11.2002 Description Search / examination 8
25.11.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 Drawings Search / examination 2
25.11.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6