blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1422436


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.08.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2007  [2007/38]
13.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.05.2007  [2007/20]
23.02.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2007  [2007/13]
09.02.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2007  [2007/11]
24.11.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2006  [2006/52]
08.09.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2006  [2006/41]
01.09.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2006  [2006/40]
01.09.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.10.2006  [2006/40]
18.08.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2006  [2006/38]
04.08.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2006  [2006/36]
28.07.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2006  [2006/35]
21.07.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2006  [2006/34]
14.07.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2006  [2006/33]
23.06.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.07.2006  [2006/30]
02.06.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.07.2006  [2006/27]
19.05.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.06.2006  [2006/25]
05.05.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.06.2006  [2006/23]
16.09.2005 Change - representative published on  02.11.2005  [2005/44]
09.09.2005 (Expected) grant published on  26.10.2005  [2005/43]
26.07.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.07.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.05.2005 Change - applicant published on  29.06.2005  [2005/26]
06.05.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.04.2005 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
27.04.2005 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
20.04.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.01.2005 First examination report
05.01.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.12.2004 Definitive list of designations published on  16.02.2005  [2005/07]
10.12.2004 Request for examination filed published on  26.01.2005  [2005/04]
26.11.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2004 Amendment by applicant
09.04.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.05.2004  [2004/22]