blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1422436
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7077562Global Dossier 18.07.2006B2
US2005281137 22.12.2005A1
Priority number Date
CH0300709 30.10.2003
EP02026147 25.11.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4515913BGlobal Dossier 04.08.2010B2
JP2006507454 02.03.2006A
Priority number Date
CH0300709 30.10.2003
EP02026147 25.11.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003271504 18.06.2004A1
Priority number Date
CH0300709 30.10.2003
EP02026147 25.11.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2004048800Global Dossier 10.06.2004A1
Priority number Date
EP02026147 25.11.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1422436Global Dossier 26.10.2005B1
EP1422436 26.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
EP02026147 25.11.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT307990T 15.11.2005T
Priority number Date
EP02026147 25.11.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN100360828C 09.01.2008C
CN1717552 04.01.2006A
Priority number Date
EP02026147 25.11.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE60206939T 27.07.2006T2
DE60206939D 01.12.2005D1
Priority number Date
EP02026147 25.11.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1067687 19.05.2006A1
Priority number Date
EP02026147 25.11.2002