Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1422436

EP1422436 - Spiral watch spring and its method of production [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 19.09.2007  [2007/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA
Jaquet-Droz 1
2007 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA
Jaquet-Droz 1
2007 Neuchâtel / CH
Former [2004/22]For all designated states
CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA
Rue Jaquet-Droz 1
2007 Neuchâtel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Bourgeois, Claude
Ministre 18
2014 Bôle / CH
02 / Perret, André
Vergers 3
2206 Les Geneveys-sur-Coffrane / CH
03 / Hoogerwerf, Arnold Christiaan
En Rueta 3
2036 Cormondréche / CH
 [2004/22]
Representative(s)Bovard SA Neuchâtel
Rue des Noyers 11
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]GLN
Rue du Puits-Godet 8a
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Former [2004/22]Gresset, Jean
GLN Gresset & Laesser Neuchâtel Puits-Godet 8A
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date02026147.525.11.2002
[2004/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1422436
Date:26.05.2004
Language:FR
[2004/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1422436
Date:26.10.2005
Language:FR
[2005/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:F16F1/10, F16F1/02, G04B1/14
[2004/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/22]
TitleGerman:Spiraluhrwerkfeder und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[2004/22]
English:Spiral watch spring and its method of production[2004/22]
French:Ressort spiral de montre et son procédé de fabrication[2004/22]
Examination procedure18.11.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/04]
11.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2005Fee for grant paid
18.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.10.2005
CZ26.10.2005
EE26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
IT26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
TR26.10.2005
CY25.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
LU26.12.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
[2007/38]
Former [2007/20]AT26.10.2005
CZ26.10.2005
EE26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
TR26.10.2005
CY25.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
LU26.12.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2007/13]AT26.10.2005
CZ26.10.2005
EE26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
TR26.10.2005
BE30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
LU26.12.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2007/11]AT26.10.2005
CZ26.10.2005
EE26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
TR26.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
LU26.12.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/52]AT26.10.2005
CZ26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
TR26.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/40]AT26.10.2005
CZ26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT26.10.2005
CZ26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/35]AT26.10.2005
CZ26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
DK26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
DK26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/33]FI26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
SE26.01.2006
ES06.02.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/30]FI26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/25]FI26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/23]FI26.10.2005
NL26.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH06117470  ;
 [X]JPS6188033  ;
 [E]DE10127733  (SILICIUM ENERGIESYSTEME E K DR) [E] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4922756  (HENRION W S) [A] 4,5 * column 3, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]WO0204836  (HARA TATSUO ;SEIKO EPSON CORP (JP)) [A] 4,5 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]JPH0434226  ;
 [A]JPH04185698
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940729), vol. 018, no. 408, Database accession no. (M - 1647), & JP06117470 A 19940426 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860910), vol. 010, no. 265, Database accession no. (M - 515), & JP61088033 A 19860506 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920518), vol. 016, no. 208, Database accession no. (M - 1249), & JP04034226 A 19920205 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921016), vol. 016, no. 501, Database accession no. (C - 0996), & JP04185698 A 19920702 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] * abstract *