Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316525

EP1316525 - Elevator monitoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aufzugswerke M. Schmitt & Sohn GmbH & Co.
Hadermühle 9-15
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Wedel, Andreas
Wittelsbacherstrasse 102b
90475 Nürnberg / DE
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]LOUIS- PÖHLAU- LOHRENTZ
Postfach 3055
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date02026148.325.11.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateDE200115907401.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10159074
[2003/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316525
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:B66B5/00
[2003/23]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/09]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Aufzugüberwachungssystem[2003/23]
English:Elevator monitoring system[2003/23]
French:Système de surveillance pour ascenseur[2003/23]
Examination procedure05.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
26.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004SK   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
13.01.2004M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2000351547  ;
 [X]US5131508  (SUZUKI SHIGEHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [XY]JPH09267984  ;
 [YA]JPH05139642  ;
 [A]JPH09194156  ;
 [A]JP2001006071
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, [X] 1-5 * abstract *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 17, [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 6-10
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930922), vol. 017, no. 527, Database accession no. (M - 1484), [Y] 6-10 * abstract * [A] 1
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, [A] 1,2,6,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, [A] 1 * abstract *