Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318452

EP1318452 - Installing software on a mobile computing device using the rollback and security features of a configuration manager [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  19.03.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2010New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Peev, Igor B.
7320 12th Ave. N.W.
Seattle, WA 98117 / US
02 / Shell, Scott R.
8500 148th Ave. N.E., Apt. D1012
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
03 / Savage, Kevin J.
21016 N.E. 33rd Place
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
04 / Dang, Hung M.
1105 Spring Street, Apt. 1203
Seattle, WA 98104 / US
05 / Hofmeister, Nicholas M.
18601 N.E. 61st Court, Apt. No. V104
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02026267.126.11.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateUS2001000595905.12.2001         Original published format: US 5959
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318452
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/445
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/24]
TitleGerman:Installation von Software auf einem mobilen Rechengerät unter Ausnutzung der Rollback- und Security-features eines Konfigurationsmanagers[2003/24]
English:Installing software on a mobile computing device using the rollback and security features of a configuration manager[2003/24]
French:Installation de logiciels dans un ordinateur mobile utilisant des caractéristiques de reprise et de sécurité d'un gestionnaire de configuration[2003/24]
Examination procedure05.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/02]
14.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/16]
10.09.2009Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/16]
04.12.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0811942  (CYBER MEDIA INC [US]) [X] 1-30 * page 3, line 41 - line 48 * * page 6, line 49 - page 7, line 21 * * page 11, line 1 - line 39 * * page 11, line 56 - page 12, line 15 *;
 [X]US6199204  (DONOHUE SEAMUS [IR]) [X] 1-30 * column 5, line 36 - line 48 * * column 10, line 36 - line 50 * * column 12, line 38 - line 44 * * column 18, line 19 - line 34 *;
 [A]EP1043906  (PHONE COM INC [US]) [A] * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] *;
 [A]EP0791881  (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [A] * abstract * * page 3, line 14 - line 25 *
 [X]  - HALL R S ET AL, "Evaluating software deployment languages and schema: an experience report", PROCEEDINGS. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOFTWARE MAINTENANCE (CAT. NO. 98CB36272), PROCEEDINGS. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOFTWARE MAINTENANCE, BETHESDA, MD, USA, 16-20 NOV. 1998, 1998, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc, USA, ISBN 0-8186-8779-7, pages 177 - 185, XP002235389 [X] 1-30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSM.1998.738507
 [A]  - "DESIGNS FOR UNCOMMITTING AN INSTAL PLAN OBJECT", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19950701), vol. 38, no. 7, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 227 - 229, XP000521671