Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321023

EP1321023 - Method of determining the loss in agricultural machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/26]Method of determining the loss in agricultural maschines
[2008/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Münsterstrasse 33
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Münsterstrasse 33
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH
Münsterstr. 33
33428 Harsewinkel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bernhardt, Gerd, Prof.
Pulverweg 3c
01728 Bannewitz/OT Hänichen / DE
02 / Hübner, Ralf, Dr.
Fritz-Reuter-Strasse 2
01097 Dresden / DE
 [2003/26]
Application number, filing date02026556.728.11.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateDE200116235418.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10162354
[2003/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321023
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321023
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:A01D41/12
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verlustbestimmung an landwirtschaftlichen Erntemaschinen[2003/26]
English:Method of determining the loss in agricultural machines[2008/47]
French:Procédé de determination des pertes dans des machines agricoles[2003/26]
Former [2003/26]Method of determining the loss in agricultural maschines
Examination procedure29.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
20.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2008Fee for grant paid
22.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2010/47]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/08]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/50]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/49]CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/47]DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
Former [2009/46]DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
Former [2009/37]FI25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/34]NL25.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[DXA]EP0728409  (DEERE & CO [US]) [DX] 14,15 * column 3, line 16 - column 8, line 56; figures 2,3 * [A] 1-13;
 [XA]US4360998  (SOMES RICHARD K) [X] 14,15 * column 4, line 42 - column 10, line 35; figures 1,2,7 * [A] 1-13;
 [AD]US5015997  (STRUBBE GILBERT J I [BE]) [AD] 1-15 * column 8, line 17 - column 13, line 10; figure - *;
 [A]EP0347979  (FORD NEW HOLLAND INC [BE]) [A] 1-15 * column 12, line 24 - column 13, line 13; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19807145  (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *