Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319673

EP1319673 - Polymers, modified by functionalised groups [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 22.06.2005  [2005/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[2003/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Grün Michael, Dr.
Kaldauer Str. 44
53721 Siegburg / DE
02 / Braubach, Wilfried
Steinberg 7
42659 Solingen / DE
 [2003/25]
Application number, filing date02026830.629.11.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateDE200116084912.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10160849
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319673
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:C08F8/30, C08F8/42, C08C19/42
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/11]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Polymere, die durch funktionelle Gruppen modifiziert sind[2003/25]
English:Polymers, modified by functionalised groups[2003/25]
French:Polymères modifiés par des groupes fonctionnalisés[2003/25]
Examination procedure18.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
11.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0150479  (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 30; claims 1-9 *;
 [Y]EP0198294  (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 13; claims 1-9 *;
 [Y]EP0849333  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0661298  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 13, line 44 - page 14, line 10; claims 1-33 *