Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318568

EP1318568 - Connector with shutter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FCI
145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/43]For all designated states
FCI
145/147 rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
FCI
53, rue de Châteaudun
75009 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Kameda, Yasutoshi
442-1, Ushika
Ichihara-shi, Chiba / JP
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02026874.402.12.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateJP2001036970104.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001369701
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1318568
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1318568
Date:22.10.2003
[2003/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318568
Date:25.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/453, H01R13/648
[2003/43]
Former International [2003/24]H01R13/453
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/24]
TitleGerman:Stecker mit Schutzblende[2003/24]
English:Connector with shutter[2003/24]
French:Connecteur avec volet d'obturation[2003/24]
Examination procedure21.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/25]
21.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2006Fee for grant paid
08.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CH25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
IT25.10.2006
LI25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
TR25.10.2006
LU02.12.2006
IE04.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
ES05.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CH25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
IT25.10.2006
LI25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
TR25.10.2006
LU02.12.2006
IE04.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
ES05.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2008/28]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CH25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
IT25.10.2006
LI25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
IE04.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
ES05.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2008/20]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CH25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
IT25.10.2006
LI25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
IE04.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
ES05.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/48]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CH25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
IT25.10.2006
LI25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
IE04.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
ES05.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/46]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CH25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
IT25.10.2006
LI25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
ES05.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/38]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CH25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
IT25.10.2006
LI25.10.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
ES05.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/30]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CH25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
LI25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
ES05.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/27]AT25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
ES05.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/25]FI25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
ES05.02.2007
Former [2007/21]ES05.02.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]US5035633  (KOBAYASHI HIROMICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8 * column 4, line 26 - column 7, line 20; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]US5167516  (TAN HAW-CHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5679013  (MATSUNAGA KATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figures 4,11-13,23-25 *