Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316287

EP1316287 - Ophthalmic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/23]Ophthalmic apparatus and corneal surgery apparatus
[2006/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2008
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIDEK CO., LTD
34-14 Maehama Hiroishi-cho Gamagori-shi
Aichi 443-0038 / JP
[2007/09]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
NIDEK CO., LTD
7-9, Sakae-cho
Gamagori-shi, Aichi 443-0035 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujieda, Masanao
153 Kawasaki-cho
Toyohashi-shi, Aichi-ken 440-0094 / JP
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date02026927.003.12.2002
[2003/23]
Priority number, dateJP2001036926103.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001369261
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1316287
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1316287
Date:03.12.2003
[2003/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316287
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/117, A61B3/11, A61F9/01, A61B3/12, A61B3/103, A61B3/107
[2003/28]
Former International [2003/23]A61B3/103, A61B3/107, A61B3/117
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/35]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Ophthalmische Vorrichtung[2006/34]
English:Ophthalmic apparatus[2006/34]
French:Appareil ophthalmique[2006/34]
Former [2003/23]Ophthalmische Vorrichtung und Vorrichtung zur Chirurgie der Hornhaut
Former [2003/23]Ophthalmic apparatus and corneal surgery apparatus
Former [2003/23]Appareil ophthalmique et appareil pour la chirurgie cornéenne
Examination procedure11.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/20]
04.06.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.09.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR
18.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2007Fee for grant paid
04.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.07.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004BG   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004CZ   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004EE   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004SI   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004SK   M01   Not yet paid
08.07.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0850614  (NIDEK KK [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,8-10 * column 1, lines 3-37 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 7 * * column 5, line 50 - column 8, line 6 * * column 9, line 51 - column 10, line 26; figures 1,5,12 * [Y] 6,7;
 [Y]US6299311  (WILLIAMS DAVID R [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 35 *;
 [X]EP1153584  (NIDEK KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 34 *;
 [X]US6322216  (YEE KINGMAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 27 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5637109  (SUMIYA TOSHIFUMI [JP]) [A] 10-12 * column 2, lines 11-50 * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 45 *;
 [A]EP1138290  (NIDEK KK [JP]) [A] 10-12 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 55 * * column 5, lines 28-58 *
by applicantUS5907388
 JPH10108837
 US6033075
 JPH11342152
 US6086204