Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318129

EP1318129 - Process for the selective liquid-phase hydrogenation of carbonyl compounds to the corresponding alcohols in the presence of a Pt/ZnO catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Haake, Mathias, Dr.
R 4,3
68161 Mannheim / DE
02 / Gerlach, Till, Dr.
Am Weidenschlag 18
67071 Ludwigshafen / DE
03 / Funke, Frank, Dr.
Q7 12a
68161 Mannheim / DE
 [2003/24]
Application number, filing date02027071.603.12.2002
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateDE200116014107.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10160141
[2003/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1318129
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1318129
Date:05.11.2003
[2003/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318129
Date:22.11.2006
Language:DE
[2006/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:C07C29/141, C07C33/025
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesRO06.05.2004
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur selektiven Flüssigphasenhydrierung von Carbonylverbindungen zu den entsprechenden Alkoholen in Gegenwart eines Pt/ZnO-Katalysators[2003/24]
English:Process for the selective liquid-phase hydrogenation of carbonyl compounds to the corresponding alcohols in the presence of a Pt/ZnO catalyst[2003/24]
French:Procédé pour l'hydrogénation sélective en phase liquide de composés carbonyles en alcools correspondants en présence d'un catalysateur Pt/ZnO[2003/24]
Examination procedure06.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/28]
09.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2006Fee for grant paid
09.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.11.2006
CZ22.11.2006
EE22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
FR22.11.2006
IE22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
SI22.11.2006
SK22.11.2006
TR22.11.2006
AT03.12.2006
LU03.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
GR23.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
[2009/03]
Former [2008/52]CZ22.11.2006
EE22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
FR22.11.2006
IE22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
SI22.11.2006
SK22.11.2006
TR22.11.2006
AT03.12.2006
LU03.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
GR23.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
Former [2008/37]CZ22.11.2006
EE22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
IE22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
SI22.11.2006
SK22.11.2006
TR22.11.2006
AT03.12.2006
LU03.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
GR23.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
FR13.07.2007
Former [2008/28]CZ22.11.2006
EE22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
IE22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
SI22.11.2006
SK22.11.2006
AT03.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
GR23.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
FR13.07.2007
Former [2008/23]CZ22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
IE22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
SI22.11.2006
SK22.11.2006
AT03.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
GR23.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
FR13.07.2007
Former [2008/20]CZ22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
IE22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
SI22.11.2006
SK22.11.2006
AT03.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
GR23.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
Former [2008/13]CZ22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
IE22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
SI22.11.2006
SK22.11.2006
AT03.12.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
Former [2007/49]CZ22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
IE22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
SI22.11.2006
SK22.11.2006
BE31.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
Former [2007/46]CZ22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
IE22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
SI22.11.2006
SK22.11.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
Former [2007/42]CZ22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
IE22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
Former [2007/38]CZ22.11.2006
FI22.11.2006
IT22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
MC31.12.2006
BG22.02.2007
DK22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
PT23.04.2007
Former [2007/28]FI22.11.2006
NL22.11.2006
BG22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
Former [2007/25]FI22.11.2006
BG22.02.2007
SE22.02.2007
Documents cited:Search[DX]US4100180  (ICHIKAWA YATARO, et al) [DX] 1-3,6-15,18 * examples 1A,2,3-11 *;
 [X]DE2650046  (RHONE POULENC IND) [X] 1-3,6-8,12,13,18 * page 10, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; example 10; claims 1,9,10 *;
 [A]US6294696  (DIDILLON BLAISE [FR], et al) [A] 1-18 * example 2 *;
 [A]US5118884  (DIDILLON BLAISE [FR], et al) [A] 1-18 * examples 1-3,10,11 *;
 [X]  - RECCHIA S. ET AL., "Outstanding Performances of Magnesia-Supported Platinum-Tin Catalysts for Citral SElective Hydrogenation", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (1999), vol. 184, pages 1 - 4, XP002253596 [X] 1-3,6-18 * page 2, column 2, paragraph 3; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jcat.1999.2485
 [A]  - PAULOSE M.M. ET AL., "Hydrogenation of Citral: II. Continuous and batch hydrogenation of Citral to geraniol-Nerol", JOURNAL OF THE OIL TECHNOLOGISTS' ASSOCIATION OF INDIA, (1974), pages 88 - 91, XP009007115 [A] 1-18 * Abstract; page 88 * * Results and Discussion; page 88 - page 91 *