Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319645

EP1319645 - Process for the purification of alicyclic alcohols [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 11.07.2007  [2007/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Celanese Chemicals Europe GmbH
Lurgiallee 14
60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2003/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Dukat, Wolfgang, Dr.
Holzstrasse 24
46147 Oberhausen / DE
02 / Lappe, Peter, Dr.
Eickenhof 34
46539 Dinslaken / DE
03 / Schmid, Klaus, Dr.
Heisterbusch 30
46539 Dinslaken / DE
04 / Scholz, Horst
Wilhelm-Lantermann-Strasse 61
46535 Dinslaken / DE
05 / Storm, Edgar
Ferdinandstrasse 56
46147 Oberhausen / DE
 [2003/25]
Application number, filing date02027113.604.12.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateDE200116159714.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10161597
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319645
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1319645
Date:05.11.2003
[2003/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319645
Date:26.10.2005
Language:DE
[2005/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:C07C29/80, C07C31/137, C07C35/37, C07C29/82, C07C29/84
[2003/45]
Former International [2003/25]C07C29/80, C07C31/137, C07C35/37
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Reinigung alicyclischer Alkohole[2003/25]
English:Process for the purification of alicyclic alcohols[2003/25]
French:Procédé pour la purification d'alcools alicycliques[2003/25]
Examination procedure06.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/28]
08.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2005Fee for grant paid
18.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ26.10.2005
EE26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
SI26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
TR26.10.2005
AT04.12.2005
CY04.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
[2007/28]
Former [2007/20]CZ26.10.2005
EE26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
SI26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
TR26.10.2005
CY04.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2007/11]CZ26.10.2005
EE26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
SI26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
TR26.10.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/52]CZ26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
SI26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
TR26.10.2005
MC31.12.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/48]CZ26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
SI26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
MC31.12.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/40]CZ26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
IE26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
MC31.12.2005
BG26.01.2006
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/38]CZ26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/35]CZ26.10.2005
FI26.10.2005
SK26.10.2005
DK26.01.2006
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI26.10.2005
SE26.01.2006
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/25]FI26.10.2005
PT27.03.2006
Former [2006/23]FI26.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2001131105  ;
 [DY]WO9626173  (HOECHST AG [DE], et al) [DY] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE4226282  (BOEHMKE UWE [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5264638  (NILUBOL NALINE [TH]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0378756  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3990952  (KATZEN RAPHAEL, et al) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [DY]US2889375  (GILBERT WILLIAM I, et al) [DY] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 69, Database accession no. 2001-604893, XP002253295 & JP2001131105 A 20010515 (DAICEL CHEM IND LTD) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *