Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1303029

EP1303029 - An electrical machine comprising at least two rotors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yang, Tai-Her
PO Box 108-276
Taipei / TW
[N/P]
Former [2003/16]For all designated states
Tai-Her, Yang
PO Box 108-276
Taipei / TW
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/16]
Representative(s)Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/16]Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date02027153.219.03.1996
[2003/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1303029
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1303029
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:H02K16/00
[2003/23]
Former International [2003/16]H02K16/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/16]
TitleGerman:Elektrische Maschine mit mindestens zwei Rotoren[2003/16]
English:An electrical machine comprising at least two rotors[2003/16]
French:Machine électrique avec au moins deux rotors[2003/16]
Examination procedure03.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/16]
03.12.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/15]
09.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96301880.9  / EP0797286
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
03.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
03.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200409   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2218675  (RIVIERE JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1-24 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]FR2713840  (ROCKWELL BCS FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-24 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US4883996  (AOKI KANEMASA [JP]) [X] 1-24 * abstract *;
 [X]WO9416491  (MASON ELMER B [US]) [X] 1-24 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9013937  (BOOD LOURIS [NL]) [A] 1-24 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2925670  (PAPST MOTOREN KG) [A] 1-24 * page 14, line 6 - line 16; figure - *;
 [A]DE2849869  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1-24 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]JPS57116577
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821023), vol. 6, no. 211, Database accession no. (E - 137), [A] 1 * abstract *