Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319808

EP1319808 - Valve operating system for engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2010
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.2010  [2010/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2009/34]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takahara, Naoki
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Sato, Toshiyuki
c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho
4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date02027298.506.12.2002
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateJP2001037909012.12.2001         Original published format: JP 2001379090
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319808
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1319808
Date:08.08.2007
[2007/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319808
Date:19.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:F01L13/00
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2008/16]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Ventiltriebmechanismus eines Motors[2003/25]
English:Valve operating system for engine[2003/25]
French:Dispositif de commande de soupape d'un moteur[2003/25]
Examination procedure13.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/39]
23.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.03.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR
31.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2009Fee for grant paid
01.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[D]JPH08232623  ;
 [Y]EP0639693  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,7 * column 5, lines 2-7 * * column 6, lines 7-37 *;
 [A]US2001023671  (VORIH JOSEPH M [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0761934  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,7 * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 27 *
 [D]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 46, Database accession no. 1996-462165, XP002437484 & JPH08232623 A 19960910 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [D] * abstract *
by applicantJPH08232623